EP3134629 - FLUID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/09] | FLUID FLOW VALVE | ||
[2018/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14 Avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANCHES, Michael 7 Avenue Lefevre 94420 Le Plessis-Trevise / FR | 02 /
DAVOULT, Guillaume 6 rue Phileas Fogg 95000 Cergy / FR | [2017/11] |
Former [2017/09] | 01 /
SANCHES, Michael 7 Avenue Lefevre 94420 Le Plessis-Trevise / FR | ||
02 /
DAVOULT, Guillaume 1 Rue de la Justice Verte 95000 Cergy / FR | Representative(s) | Garcia, Christine Propriété Intellectuelle Valeo Systèmes de Contrôle Moteur 14, avenue des Béguines 95800 Cergy St Christophe / FR | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 15725782.5 | 22.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015FR51093 | Priority number, date | FR20140053601 | 22.04.2014 Original published format: FR 1453601 | [2017/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015162379 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134629 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3134629 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02D9/10 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
F02D9/1065 (EP,CN);
F02D9/107 (EP,CN);
F02M26/70 (EP);
F02M26/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSVENTIL | [2018/08] | English: | FLUID VALVE | [2018/08] | French: | VANNE DE CIRCULATION DE FLUIDE | [2017/09] |
Former [2017/09] | FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRÖMUNGSVENTIL | ||
Former [2017/09] | FLUID FLOW VALVE | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 18.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Request for further processing for: | 18.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 18.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2017 | Decision despatched | 18.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 18.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2015 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | GB | 22.04.2019 | IE | 22.04.2019 | LU | 22.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.04.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.04.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.04.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.04.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.04.2019 | ||
IE | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 22.04.2019 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1515023 (MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 16 - column 5, paragraph 20; figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP1515022 (MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 16 - column 5, paragraph 21; figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2006231072 (SAITO YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 1, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 51; figures 3-5 *; | [X]EP2562451 (VALEO SYS CONTROLE MOTEUR SAS [FR]) [X] 1,6 * abstract ** column 10, paragraph 46 - paragraph 50; figure 10 * | by applicant | FR2992046 |