EP3132171 - A TUBULAR INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR J-LAYING TUBULARS, MARINE PIPELAY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A TUBULAR OR ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Itrec B.V. Admiraal Trompstraat 2 3115 HH Schiedam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/08] | For all designated states Itrec B.V. Admiraal Trompstraat 2 3115 HH Schiedam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROODENBURG, Joop c/o 2, Admiraal Trompstraat 3115 HH Schiedam / NL | 02 /
NOUWENS, Ronny Lambertus Waltherus c/o 2, Admiraal Trompstraat 3115 HH Schiedam / NL | 03 /
VEHMEIJER, Terence Willem August c/o 2, Admiraal Trompstraat 3115 HH Schiedam / NL | [2017/08] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2017/08] | Application number, filing date | 15726371.6 | 14.04.2015 | [2017/08] | WO2015NL50242 | Priority number, date | NL20142012616 | 14.04.2014 Original published format: NL 2012616 | [2017/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015160245 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3132171 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16L1/19, F16L1/20 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
F16L1/207 (EP,CN,US);
F16L1/19 (EP,CN,US);
B63B35/03 (US);
F16L1/202 (EP,CN,US);
F16L1/203 (EP,CN,US);
E21B19/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] | Title | German: | ROHRFÖRMIGES INSTALLATIONSSYSTEM FÜR J-VERLEGEROHRE, UNTERWASSERROHRSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES ROHRS ODER ZUBEHÖRS | [2017/08] | English: | A TUBULAR INSTALLATION SYSTEM FOR J-LAYING TUBULARS, MARINE PIPELAY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A TUBULAR OR ACCESSORY | [2017/08] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INSTALLATION DE TUBES POUR LA POSE EN J DE TUBES, SYSTÈME DE POSE DE TUYAUX EN MER ET PROCÉDÉS DE MANIPULATION D'UN TUBE OU D'UN ACCESSOIRE | [2017/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 10.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YDA]WO2012091560 (ITREC BV [NL], et al) [YD] 1-7,10-19 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 9 * * page 12, line 4 - page 20, line 26 * * figures 1a,1b,2,3b,4c * [A] 8,9; | [Y]WO2013089561 (ITREC BV [NL]) [Y] 1-7,10-19 * page 9, line 21 - page 12, line 19 * * page 25, line 21 - page 26, line 27 * * page 34, line 7 - page 37, line 19 ** figures 10,11,19-24,29,37 * | by applicant | WO2012091560 |