EP3011123 - HINGE FOR THE ROTATABLE MOVEMENT OF A DOOR, A DOOR LEAF OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/17] | H INGE FOR THE ROTATABLE MOVEMENT OF A DOOR, A DOOR LEAF OR THE LIKE | ||
[2017/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OL.MI Srl Via dell'Industria 15 37014 Castelnuovo del Garda (VR) / IT | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIGLIORANZO, Ivano Via Marco Polo 15 I-37067 Valeggio sul Mincio (VR) / IT | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Autuori, Angelo, et al Eureka IP Consulting Via Monte Cengio, 32 36100 Vicenza / IT | [2018/07] |
Former [2016/17] | Autuori, Angelo, et al EUREKA IP Consulting Borgo Santa Lucia, 31 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 15726695.8 | 16.04.2015 | [2016/17] | WO2015IB52792 | Priority number, date | IT2014VI00113 | 16.04.2014 Original published format: IT VI20140113 | [2016/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015159256 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3011123 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3011123 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E05F1/10, E05F3/10, E05D11/10 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
E05F3/104 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E05D11/1064 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E05F1/105 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E05Y2201/638 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E05Y2201/688 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E05Y2900/146 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | E05F1/10, E05D11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIER ZUR DREHBEWEGUNG EINER TÜR, EINES TÜRFLÜGELS ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2016/17] | English: | HINGE FOR THE ROTATABLE MOVEMENT OF A DOOR, A DOOR LEAF OR THE LIKE | [2017/38] | French: | CHARNIÈRE POUR LE MOUVEMENT ROTATIF D'UNE PORTE, D'UN BATTANT DE PORTE, OU AUTRES | [2016/17] |
Former [2016/17] | H INGE FOR THE ROTATABLE MOVEMENT OF A DOOR, A DOOR LEAF OR THE LIKE | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18156351.1 / EP3354832 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2015 | AL | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | MT | 16.04.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.04.2015 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.04.2015 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0756663 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,11-15,23 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] * * figures 2,3 * [A] 16-21 [Y] 22; | [X]US5867869 (GARRETT RODNEY G [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-15,23 * column 6, lines 1-51 * * figures 5,9-11 *; | [XA]EP2148033 (FREEMAN & PARDOE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,11-15,23 * paragraphs [0014] - [0019] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5; | [XAY]EP2333212 (GH ITALY S R L [IT]) [X] 1-4,11-15,23 * paragraphs [0021] - [0036]; figures 1,2,3,4 * [A] 5-10[Y] 22 | Examination | DE202010011929U | by applicant | EP0756663 | US5867869 | EP2148033 | WO2012IB51006 | IT2013VI00195 | WO2015IB52674 |