EP3161170 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION OF HARDENING OF A CLOTHING WIRE FOR THE PROCESSING OF TEXTILE FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/18] | METHOD FOR TEMPERING A CLOTHING WIRE FOR PROCESSING TEXTILE FIBRES AND PLANT THEREFOR | ||
[2018/14] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trützschler Group SE Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2022/37] |
Former [2017/18] | For all designated states Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 41199 Mönchengladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAARER, Friedrich Trützschler CardClothing GmbH Rosenstr. 7 75387 Neubulach / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 15726860.8 | 08.05.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015EP00951 | Priority number, date | DE201410108822 | 24.06.2014 Original published format: DE102014108822 | [2017/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015197150 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3161170 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3161170 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/30] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3161170 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/26, C21D9/52, C21D9/56, C21D9/573, C21D1/52, C21D6/00, C21D1/18, C21D1/63 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
C21D9/26 (EP,CN,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C21D1/52 (EP,CN,US);
C21D1/63 (EP,US);
C21D6/00 (EP,US);
C21D9/525 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | C21D8/06, C21D9/26, C21D9/52, C21D9/56, C21D9/573, C21D1/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HÄRTEN EINES GARNITURDRAHTES FÜR DIE BEARBEITUNG VON TEXTILFASERN UND ANLAGE HIERZU | [2017/18] | English: | METHOD AND INSTALLATION OF HARDENING OF A CLOTHING WIRE FOR THE PROCESSING OF TEXTILE FIBERS | [2018/14] | French: | MÉTHODE ET DISPOSITIF DE DURCISSEMENT D'UN FIL DE CARDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES FIBRES DE TEXTILE | [2018/14] |
Former [2017/18] | METHOD FOR TEMPERING A CLOTHING WIRE FOR PROCESSING TEXTILE FIBRES AND PLANT THEREFOR | ||
Former [2017/18] | PROCÉDÉ DE DURCISSEMENT D'UN FIL DE GARNITURE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE FIBRES TEXTILES ET INSTALLATION ASSOCIÉE | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 21.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2019
02.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE Opponent's representative Weber, Jan Thorsten Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2019/23] | 13.05.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.09.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.09.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.09.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2015 | AL | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | PT | 25.11.2018 | GB | 08.05.2019 | IE | 08.05.2019 | LU | 08.05.2019 | FR | 31.05.2019 | AT | 08.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/37] | HU | 08.05.2015 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
AT | 08.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.05.2015 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.05.2015 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
PT | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
IE | 08.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
LU | 08.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US503398 (DANIEL CONRADE BATEMAN) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5145534 (WEEDAEGHE JOZEF [BE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1078994 (GRAF & CO AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1728878 (GRAF & CO AG [CH]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101519716 (GERON CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]CN103436662 (ZHANGJIAGANG SHENGDA STEEL ROPE CO LTD) [A] 1-14* the whole document * | by applicant | DE102005025627 | Opposition | US2788790 | US2930724 | US3101400 | DE2330303 | US4620884 | EP0216434 | US5123529 | DE102005025627 | - Hans Jurgen Bargel et al, "Eisenwerkstoffe", Werkstoffkunde, (20050000), pages 180 - 183, XP055585552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-29250-0_4 | - Hans Jurgen Bargel et al, "Eisenwerkstoffe", Werkstoffkunde, (20050000), pages 180 - 183 |