Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10529524 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2020 | B2 | US2017053767 | 23.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | WO2015GB51263 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2946245 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | WO2015GB51263 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015255078B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2018 | B2 | AU2015255078 | 24.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | WO2015GB51263 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3138115 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2019 | B1 | EP3138115 | 08.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | WO2015GB51263 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016024950 | 15.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | WO2015GB51263 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK201670926 | 12.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | WO2015GB51263 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2016141115 | 30.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | WO2015GB51263 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015166252 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2525631 | 03.05.2017 | B | GB2525631 | 04.11.2015 | A | GB201407583D0 | 11.06.2014 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201407583 | 30.04.2014 |