Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10144863 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2018 | B2 | US2017183559 | 29.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201515313152 | 21.05.2015 | US201462002430 | 23.05.2014 | WO2015US31921 | 21.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2949442 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462002430 | 23.05.2014 | WO2015US31921 | 21.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3146012 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2018 | B1 | EP3146012 | 29.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462002430 | 23.05.2014 | WO2015US31921 | 21.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015179611 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462002430 | 23.05.2014 |