Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170013233 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414290298 | 29.05.2014 | WO2015US32557 | 27.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6612784B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | B2 | JP2017517206 | 22.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414290298 | 29.05.2014 | WO2015US32557 | 27.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106465244 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414290298 | 29.05.2014 | WO2015US32557 | 27.05.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3150002 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414290298 | 29.05.2014 | WO2015US32557 | 27.05.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015183877 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414290298 | 29.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9609579 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2017 | B2 | US2015351010 | 03.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414290298 | 29.05.2014 |