EP3151728 - DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING APNOEA OF A SUBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEANNE, Vincent c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Coops, Peter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15727397.0 | 04.06.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015EP62532 | Priority number, date | EP20140171536 | 06.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14171536 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015185706 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3151728 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/0205, A61B5/08, A61B5/113, A61B5/024 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/4818 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/7246 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/02416 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON ATEMSTILLSTAND BEI EINER PERSON | [2017/15] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING APNOEA OF A SUBJECT | [2017/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER L'APNÉE D'UN SUJET | [2017/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0072601 (KEARNS KENNETH LAYNE) [Y] 1,2,5-7,10-13 * abstract * * page 11, lines 1-15 * * page 21, line 34 - page 24, line 10 * * page 73, line 23 - page 74, line 33; figures 1,27-30,41-44 * [A] 3,4; | [A]US4803997 (BOWMAN BRUCE R [US]) [A] 1-13* column 1, lines 37-47 *; | [A]WO2009138976 (EARLYSENSE LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010100594 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 4 * * page 7, line 13 - page 11, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [Y] - JAE HYUK SHIN ET AL, "Nonconstrained Sleep Monitoring System and Algorithms Using Air-Mattress With Balancing Tube Method", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IN BIOMEDICINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20100101), vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TITB.2009.2034011, ISSN 1089-7771, pages 147 - 156, XP011345641 [Y] 1-13 * page 148, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 153, column 2, paragraph 4; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TITB.2009.2034011 |