EP3102448 - SEAL FOR SLIDING GLASS FOR A VEHICLE AND SEALING MODULE HAVING GLASS GUIDING MEANS AND A DOOR FRAME ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/50] | RUN SEAL FOR VEHICLE WINDOW AND SEALING MODULE INCORPORATING MEANS FOR GUIDING THE WINDOW IN THE SEAL AND AN ELEMENT OF THE DOOR FRAME | ||
[2018/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, Rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOTTIAU, Olivier 44 Rue des Alouettes 45120 Cepoy / FR | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Gevers & Orès 36 rue de Saint-Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 15727431.7 | 28.04.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015FR51147 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016174315 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102448 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3102448 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60J10/00 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
B60J10/79 (EP,US);
B60J10/74 (EP,KR,US);
B60J10/17 (US);
B60J10/365 (KR);
B60J10/88 (EP,KR,US);
B60J5/0402 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITDICHTUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINE GLASSCHEIBE EINES FAHRZEUGES UND DICHTUNGSMODULE MIT GLASGLEITDICHTUNGSMITTEL UND TÜREINFASSUNGSELEMENT. | [2018/41] | English: | SEAL FOR SLIDING GLASS FOR A VEHICLE AND SEALING MODULE HAVING GLASS GUIDING MEANS AND A DOOR FRAME ELEMENT | [2018/41] | French: | JOINT DE COULISSE POUR VITRAGE DE VEHICULE ET MODULE D'ETANCHEITE INCORPORANT DES MOYENS DE GUIDAGE DU VITRAGE DANS LE JOINT ET UN ELEMENT DU CADRE DE PORTE | [2016/50] |
Former [2016/50] | DICHTUNG FÜR SCHIEBESCHEIBE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND DICHTUNGSMODUL MIT GLASFÜHRUNGSMITTELN UND EINEM TÜRRAHMENELEMENT | ||
Former [2016/50] | RUN SEAL FOR VEHICLE WINDOW AND SEALING MODULE INCORPORATING MEANS FOR GUIDING THE WINDOW IN THE SEAL AND AN ELEMENT OF THE DOOR FRAME | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 17.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2015 | AL | 09.01.2019 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IE | 28.04.2019 | LU | 28.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.04.2015 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.04.2015 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IE | 28.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LU | 28.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0068367 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-7,10,11 * figures 3,7 * [Y] 12-15 [I] 8,9,16; | [X]EP0083696 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,8,10,16 * figures 2,4,5 *; | [Y]US4662113 (WEAVER WILLIAM R [US]) [Y] 1,7,10 * figure 3 *; | [Y]FR2747345 (STANDARD PRODUCTS IND [FR]) [Y] 1,7,10,12-15 * figure 3; claim 9 *; | [XD]US2006021282 (TAMAOKI KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [XD] 1,7,10* figure 2 *; | [XD]US2006037249 (KAWAMURA TOHRU [JP]) [XD] 1,2,7,10 * figures 2,3,4 * | by applicant | US2006021282 | US2006037249 |