EP3155880 - FLEXIBLE LED ASSEMBLY WITH UV PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALANISWAMY, Ravi 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | 02 /
NARAG, Alejandro Aldrin II Agcaoili 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | 03 /
FOO, Siang Sin 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | 04 /
KOSUGI, Hiromitsu 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15727807.8 | 26.05.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US32363 | Priority number, date | US201462010224P | 10.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462010224 P | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015191273 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155880 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/03, B32B15/08, H05K1/18, H05K3/28 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K1/036 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L33/62 (US);
B32B27/281 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L33/486 (US);
H01L33/58 (US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K1/0346 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K1/189 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K3/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2255/20 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2457/202 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2933/0033 (US);
H01L2933/0058 (US);
H01L2933/0066 (US);
H05K2201/0154 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K2201/017 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05K2201/0179 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE LED-ANORDNUNG MIT UV-SCHUTZ | [2017/16] | English: | FLEXIBLE LED ASSEMBLY WITH UV PROTECTION | [2017/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE À DEL SOUPLE À PROTECTION UV | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 24.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]DE3644310 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document * [A] 11-15; | [XAY]EP2490513 (ESSENCE SOLAR SOLUTIONS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 11-15 [Y] 9,10; | [XYI]WO2012112873 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [X] 9 * page 11, line 22 - page 13, line 10; figures 11A-11D,12,13A-13E * [Y] 9,10[I] 10 |