EP3139984 - NEBULIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2021/17] |
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICHER, Joachim Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
MUELLER, Markus Anton-Bruckner-Straße 12 93413 Cham / DE | 03 /
WINKLER, Robert Gerhard Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corporate Patents Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2017/11] | Application number, filing date | 15727873.0 | 04.05.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015EP00902 | Priority number, date | EP20140001603 | 07.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14001603 | EP20150020044 | 25.03.2015 Original published format: EP 15020044 | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015169430 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139984 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3139984 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M15/00, B05B11/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
A61M15/0081 (EP,US);
A61M11/007 (EP,US);
A61M15/0021 (US);
A61M15/0065 (EP,US);
A61M15/0071 (EP,US);
B05B11/0054 (EP,US);
B05B11/108 (EP,US);
B05B11/1091 (EP,US);
A61M15/0026 (EP,US);
A61M15/0035 (EP,US);
A61M15/0041 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0468 (EP,US);
A61M2205/273 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0468, A61M2202/0007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/11] | A61M15/00, A61M11/00, G06M1/02, B05B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBER | [2017/11] | English: | NEBULIZER | [2017/11] | French: | NÉBULISEUR | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 30.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | FI | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | MT | 28.04.2021 | RO | 28.04.2021 | RS | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | IE | 04.05.2021 | LU | 04.05.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | NO | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | EE | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | EE | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 04.05.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | EE | 28.04.2021 | |
FI | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RO | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 04.05.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
RS | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 28.04.2021 | |
LT | 28.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9639337 (SENETICS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 14 - line 21 * * page 6, line 2 - page 11, line 25 * * page 13, line 30 - page 23, line 12 * * page 30, line 26 - line 34 * * page 47, line 1 - line 12 * * page 51, line 10 - line 35 * * page 54, line 29 - page 60, line 24 * * figures 16-18 *; | [X]WO0103851 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-15 * page 1, line 3 - page 4, line 22 * * page 5, line 19 - page 12, line 3 * * figures 6-14 *; | [X]US2003100867 (FUCHS KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] * * figure 1 *; | [XD]US7823584 (GESER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 58 * * column 6, line 52 - column 13, line 53 * * figures 3-17 *; | [XD]WO2012162305 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT, et al) [XD] 1-15 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0162] * * paragraph [0193] * * paragraph [0212] - paragraph [0216] * * figures 6-16 *; | [X]WO2012160047 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 6 * * page 7, line 19 - page 16, line 29 ** figures 3-7 * |