Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3146368 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201580039267 EP15728300 JP2016568004 JP2020089683 JP2022101707 KR20167036042 KR20227019584 US2015032138W US201515313733 US202016821121

More

US202217983527



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12092793Global Dossier 17.09.2024B2
US2023091466 23.03.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201615313733 23.11.2016
US202016821121 17.03.2020
US201462002466 23.05.2014
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
US202217983527 09.11.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11531141Global Dossier 20.12.2022B2
US2020217990 09.07.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201615313733 23.11.2016
US202016821121 17.03.2020
US201462002466 23.05.2014
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10620344Global Dossier 14.04.2020B2
US2017199307 13.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201515313733 22.05.2015
US201462002466 23.05.2014
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102675982BGlobal Dossier 17.06.2024B1
KR20220084430 21.06.2022A
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014
KR20167036042 22.05.2015
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR102409481BGlobal Dossier 16.06.2022B1
KR20170012391 02.02.2017A
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2022123136Global Dossier 23.08.2022A
Priority number Date
JP2020089683 22.05.2020
US201462002466 23.05.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6746502BGlobal Dossier 26.08.2020B2
JP2017518529 06.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106537190BGlobal Dossier 16.08.2019B
CN106537190 22.03.2017A
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3146368Global Dossier 29.03.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014
WO2015US32138 22.05.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2015179739Global Dossier 26.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP7096858BGlobal Dossier 06.07.2022B2
JP2020126278 20.08.2020A
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI690723B 11.04.2020B
TW201602624 16.01.2016A
Priority number Date
US201462002466 23.05.2014