EP3155479 - PATTERNED GLASS LIGHT GUIDE AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENG, Ying 3-212 14820 Redmond Way Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
GOLLIER, Jacques 114 Weston Lane Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 03 /
ROSENBLUM, Steven S 1205 Hanshaw Road Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15729058.6 | 08.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US34623 | Priority number, date | US201462010093P | 10.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462010093 P | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015191418 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155479 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G02B6/0053 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B6/0043 (CN,KR,US);
G02B5/00 (CN,KR,US);
G02B6/0016 (CN,KR,US);
G02B6/0036 (CN,KR,US);
G02B6/0055 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | STRUKTURIERTER GLASLICHTLEITER UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2017/16] | English: | PATTERNED GLASS LIGHT GUIDE AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2017/16] | French: | GUIDE DE LUMIÈRE EN VERRE À MOTIFS ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 18.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN101117270 ; | [XDY]US6791636 (PAOLINI STEVEN [US], et al) [XD] 12,13,15,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 65 * [Y] 1-11,14,17-20; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20080206), vol. 2008, no. 41, Database accession no. 2008-G34880, XP002742656 & CN101117270 A 20080206 (HENAN ANCAI GAOKE CO LTD) [Y] 1-11,14,17-20 * abstract * | by applicant | US6791636 | WO2013US63622 |