EP3154703 - SOLID-JACKET SCREW CENTRIFUGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/16] | SOLID-JACKET SCREW CENTRIFUGE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME | ||
[2020/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AAGAARD, Poul-Erik Vestergaardsvej 75 Rögen DK-8472 Sporup / DK | 02 /
KRISTENSEN, Torben Ostra Langgatan 79 S-43243 Varberg / SE | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2017/16] | Application number, filing date | 15729433.1 | 11.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015EP63097 | Priority number, date | DE201410108236 | 12.06.2014 Original published format: DE102014108236 | [2017/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015189349 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3154703 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3154703 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/20, B04B15/12, B04B7/02 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
B04B15/12 (EP,CN,US);
B04B1/20 (EP,CN,US);
B04B7/02 (EP);
C02F1/52 (US);
C02F11/127 (EP,CN,US);
B04B2001/2091 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | B04B1/20, B04B15/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOLLMANTEL-SCHNECKENZENTRIFUGE | [2020/14] | English: | SOLID-JACKET SCREW CENTRIFUGE | [2020/14] | French: | CENTRIFUGEUSE À VIS À BOL PLEIN | [2020/14] |
Former [2017/16] | VOLLMANTEL-SCHNECKENZENTRIFUGE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | ||
Former [2017/16] | SOLID-JACKET SCREW CENTRIFUGE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME | ||
Former [2017/16] | CENTRIFUGEUSE À VIS À BOL PLEIN ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LE FONCTIONNEMENT DE CETTE DERNIÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2015 | AL | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 11.06.2015 | |
AL | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE1754873U (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8,11,14,16 * page 3, line 3 - line l; figure . * [I] 23; | [XI]US3245613 (JAMES JONAKIN) [X] 1,2,7,8,11-15,18 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 57; figure - * [I] 3,19,20,23-26; | [XDI]DE4315074 (BAUMANN SCHILP LUCIA [DE]) [XD] 1-6,8,10-12,17 * column 6, line 27 - column 9, line 47; figure - * [I] 18-21,23,24,27; | [XDI]DE10256674 (BAUMANN SCHILP LUCIA [DE]) [XD] 1,2,6,8,11-15,17,18 * paragraph [0069]; figure 4 *[I] 3,4,19,20,23-27; | [XI]WO2013101799 (VANDERBEKEN ENTPR LTD DBA DRYCAKE [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,11-15 * page 4, paragraph l - page 6, line 1; figure - * [I] 3,4,23 |