Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106457652B | Global Dossier | 25.10.2019 | B | CN106457652 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1455617 | 18.06.2014 | WO2015EP63677 | 18.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3157732 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2020 | B1 | EP3157732 | 26.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1455617 | 18.06.2014 | WO2015EP63677 | 18.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015193414 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1455617 | 18.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3022485 | 03.03.2017 | B1 | FR3022485 | 25.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1455617 | 18.06.2014 |