EP3155123 - METHODS OF INCREASING SEQUENCING ACCURACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/16] | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGATTI, Roberto c/o Illumina Cambridge Limited Little Chesterford Chesterford Research Place Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 02 /
BOUTELL, Jonathan Mark c/o Illumina Cambridge Limited Little Chesterford Chesterford Research Place Nr Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Thom, Russell Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15729922.3 | 12.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015GB51736 | Priority number, date | GB20140010646 | 14.06.2014 Original published format: GB 201410646 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015189637 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155123 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6844 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2531/10, C12Q2533/101, C12Q2565/501 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2531/10, C12Q2533/101, C12Q2565/501 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER SEQUENZIERUNGSGENAUIGKEIT | [2017/16] | English: | METHODS OF INCREASING SEQUENCING ACCURACY | [2017/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA PRÉCISION DU SÉQUENÇAGE | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 14.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009102878 (NUGEN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,26 * claims 1, 8 *; | [Y]US2009203085 (KURN NURITH [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * paragraph [0201] *; | [Y]WO2011025477 (ILLUMINA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * figure 8 *; | [Y]WO9844151 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-30 * figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2013131962 (ILLUMINA CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012053063 (RIGATTI ROBERTO [GB], et al) [Y] 1-30 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2014024537 (RIGATTI ROBERTO [GB], et al) [Y] 1-30 * figure 6 *; | [Y]WO2013117595 (ILLUMINA CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-30 * figure 1 * | [X] - NINA SVENSEN ET AL, "Microarray Generation of Thousand-Member Oligonucleotide Libraries", PLOS ONE, (20110923), vol. 6, no. 9, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0024906, page e24906, XP055209732 [X] 1,26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0024906 | [Y] - Kelly Grisedale ET AL, "Linear amplification of target prior to PCR for improved low template DNA results", BioTechniques, England, doi:10.2144/000114148, (20140101), page 145, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/24641479, (20150826), XP055154588 [Y] 1-30 * page 145, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2144/000114148 | [Y] - SRIKUMAR SENGUPTA ET AL, "Single Read and Paired End mRNA-Seq Illumina Libraries from 10 Nanograms Total RNA", JOURNAL OF VISUALIZED EXPERIMENTS, (20111027), no. 56, doi:10.3791/3340, XP055209733 [Y] 1-30 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3791/3340 | [Y] - VILAIN C AND VASSART G, "Small implified RNA-SAGE", METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, INC, US, (20040101), vol. 258, ISSN 1064-3745, pages 135 - 152, XP002991552 [Y] 1-30 * abstract * |