|
15.03.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Communication concerning a request to change bibliographic data after the decision to grant/decision to maintain the patent in a |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
29.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
31.10.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
10.09.2015 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.09.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.06.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.06.2015 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.06.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
04.06.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
49 |
|
04.06.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |