EP3158332 - ANALYTICAL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spinchip Diagnostics AS Forskningsparken 1 P.O. Box 124 Blindern 0314 Oslo / NO | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORCH, Stig Morten Dagaliveien 51 N-0783 Oslo / NO | 02 /
HAMSUND, Torgeir Skjerstadveien 7 N-0378 Oslo / NO | 03 /
HOLTLUND, Jostein Geir Vardeveien 17 N-1363 Høvik / NO | 04 /
GULLIKSEN, Anja Kruttveien 1B N-0585 Oslo / NO | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [2017/17] | Application number, filing date | 15730158.1 | 19.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015EP63811 | Priority number, date | NO20140000777 | 19.06.2014 Original published format: NO 20140777 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015193471 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158332 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3158332 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/54333 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01L3/50 (NO);
G01N1/10 (US);
B01L3/502 (NO);
B01L3/5021 (NO);
B01L3/5027 (NO);
B01L3/502715 (KR);
B01L3/502753 (KR,US);
B01L3/502761 (NO,US);
B03D3/00 (US);
B04B5/04 (NO);
G01N21/07 (NO);
G01N33/487 (NO);
G01N33/54313 (US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N35/08 (KR);
B01L2200/0647 (NO,US);
B01L2200/0652 (KR);
B01L2200/10 (US);
B01L2300/0681 (KR);
B01L2400/0409 (KR,NO,US);
B01L2400/0487 (US);
G01N2001/1006 (US);
G01N2035/00019 (NO);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSEVERFAHREN | [2017/17] | English: | ANALYTICAL METHOD | [2017/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ANALYTIQUE | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 06.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2015 | AL | 10.01.2018 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | LU | 19.06.2018 | MT | 19.06.2018 | SI | 19.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.06.2015 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
MK | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
MT | 19.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.06.2015 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
MT | 19.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
MT | 19.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
MT | 19.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
MT | 19.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
LU | 19.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1994987 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [AD]US2009104077 (MOMOSE SHUN [JP]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2011081530 (SINTEF STIFTELSEN [NO], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - WOOCHANG LEE ET AL, "A centrifugally actuated point-of-care testing system for the surface acoustic wave immunosensing of cardiac troponin I", THE ANALYST, (20130101), vol. 138, no. 9, doi:10.1039/c3an00182b, ISSN 0003-2654, page 2558, XP055203452 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3an00182b | [A] - PAOLO AROSIO ET AL, "Density-Gradient-Free Microfluidic Centrifugation for Analytical and Preparative Separation of Nanoparticles", NANO LETTERS, (20140514), vol. 14, no. 5, doi:10.1021/nl404771g, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 2365 - 2371, XP055203578 [A] 1-15 * fig. 1-6; p. 2366, col. 1; p. 2367, col. 1; whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl404771g | [A] - GENUNG R K ET AL, "Interaction of antibody with antigen immobilized on polystyrene latex beads: Characterization by density gradient centrifugation", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 91, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0003-2697(78)90552-3, ISSN 0003-2697, (19781201), pages 651 - 662, (19781201), XP024816407 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(78)90552-3 | by applicant | US488763 | US2009104077 | WO2011081530 | - SCHULTZ ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1985), vol. 31, page 1457 | - S. ZENG ET AL., "A review on functionalized gold nanoparticles for biosensing applications", PLASMONICS, vol. 6, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1007/s11468-011-9228-1, pages 491 - 506, XP019936264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11468-011-9228-1 | - CHENG ET AL., NANOSCALE, (2013), vol. 5, page 23 | - ANG ET AL., NANOMEDICINE, (2011), vol. 6, page 1273 |