EP3152201 - AMINOESTER DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiesi Farmaceutici S.p.A. Via Palermo, 26/A 43100 Parma / IT | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARMANI, Elisabetta c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
AMARI, Gabriele c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 03 /
CAPALDI, Carmelida c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 04 /
BLACKABY, Wesley c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 05 /
LINNEY, Ian c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 06 /
VAN DE PÖEL, Hervé c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 07 /
BAKER-GLENN, Charles c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | 08 /
TRIVEDI, Naimisha c/o CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A Via Palermo 26/A I-43100 Parma / IT | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15731261.2 | 03.06.2015 | [2017/15] | WO2015EP62417 | Priority number, date | EP20140171266 | 05.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14171266 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015185649 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3152201 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3152201 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D409/14, C07D453/02, A61K31/439, A61P11/00 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/444 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/4436 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
C07D453/02 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Extension states | BA | 02.12.2016 | ME | 02.12.2016 | Validation states | MA | 02.12.2016 | Title | German: | AMINOESTERDERIVATE | [2017/15] | English: | AMINOESTER DERIVATIVES | [2017/15] | French: | DÉRIVÉS AMINOESTÉRIFIÉS | [2018/12] |
Former [2017/15] | DÉRIVÉS AMINOESTERS | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 02.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | [2021/34] |
Former [2020/10] | MC | 29.08.2018 | |
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/09] | MC | 29.08.2018 | |
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/27] | SE | 29.08.2018 | |
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | SE | 29.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009018909 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [A]US2009203657 (CALLAHAN JAMES FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [A]WO2010089107 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [AP]US2014155373 (ARMANI ELISABETTA [IT], et al) [AP] 1-15 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [ADP]WO2014086849 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT]) [ADP] 1-15 * Abstract; claims; examples. *; | [A] - LAINÉ, "Long-acting muscarinic antagonists for the treatment of chronic obstructive pulmonary disease", EXPERT REV. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (20100101), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1586/ECP.09.48, ISSN 1751-2433, pages 43 - 53, XP008126366 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/ecp.09.48 | [A] - PROVINS ET AL., "First dual M3 antagonists-PDE4 inhibitors: Synthesis and SAR of 4,6-diaminopyrimidine derivatives", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., vol. 16, no. 7, ISSN 0960-894X, (20060401), pages 1834 - 1839, (20060401), XP027966348 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - PROVINS ET AL., "Dual M3 antagonists-PDE4 inhibitors. Part 2: Synthesis and SAR of 3-substituted azetidinyl derivatives", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (20070510), vol. 17, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.03.047, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3077 - 3080, XP022068396 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.03.047 |