EP3143584 - RIM-WISE FUNCTION ESTIMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states String Limited 219 Croydon Road Caterham Surrey CR3 6PH / GB | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states String Limited 194B Addington Road Selsdon South Croydon Surrey CR2 8LD / GB | ||
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states String Labs Limited 194B Addington Road Selsdon South Croydon, Surrey CR2 8LD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ØVERBYE, Johan c/o String Limited 219 Croydon Road Caterham Surrey CR3 6PH / GB | [2019/37] |
Former [2017/12] | 01 /
ØVERBYE, Johan c/o String Labs Limited 194B Addington Road Selsdon South Croydon Surrey CR2 8LD / GB | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [2017/12] | Application number, filing date | 15731390.9 | 13.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015GB51407 | Priority number, date | GB20140008494 | 13.05.2014 Original published format: GB 201408494 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015173567 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143584 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3143584 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/20 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (GB);
G06F18/2113 (US);
G06F7/544 (GB);
G06T2207/20024 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAND-BEI-RAND-FUNKTIONSSCHÄTZUNG | [2017/12] | English: | RIM-WISE FUNCTION ESTIMATION | [2017/12] | French: | ESTIMATION DE FONCTION PAS À PAS | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 08.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2015 | AL | 11.09.2019 | AT | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | ES | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | IT | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | GB | 13.05.2020 | IE | 13.05.2020 | LU | 13.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | NL | 01.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.05.2015 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 13.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
NL | 01.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 13.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
NL | 01.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
GB | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 13.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
NL | 01.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IE | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 13.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
NL | 01.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 13.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
NL | 01.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
NL | 01.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
AT | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010188552 (FENG GUOTONG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] *; | [XAI] - Anonymous, "Laplace Filter", (20131104), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20131104062518/http://introcs.cs.princeton.edu/java/31datatype/LaplaceFilter.java, (20150921), XP055214718 [X] 1-3,6,7,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 8,9 [I] 4,11 | [XAI] - Anonymous, "Laplacian of Gaussian (LoG)", (20120429), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120429061957/http://fourier.eng.hmc.edu/e161/lectures/gradient/node10.html, (20150921), XP055214735 [X] 1-3,5-7,10,13 * the whole document * [A] 8,9 [I] 11 | [A] - Anonymous, "The Laplace Operator", (20060904), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20060904001754/http://fourier.eng.hmc.edu/e161/lectures/gradient/node8.html, (20150921), XP055214737 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - ROSENFELD A, "PICTURE PROCESSING BY COMPUTER", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19690901), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1145/356551.356554, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 147 - 176, XP000565491 [A] 1-13 * page 156 section "The Laplacian" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/356551.356554 | [A] - RYU J ET AL, "Fast image blurring using Lookup Table for real time feature extraction", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, 2009. ISIE 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090705), ISBN 978-1-4244-4347-5, pages 1864 - 1869, XP031518538 [A] 8 * Section II-A.3) : "Box blur" * |