EP3165051 - LED DRIVER, LIGHTING SYSTEM USING THE DRIVER AND DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/11] |
Former [2018/50] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEUWLANDS, Eric Johannus Hendricus Cornelis Maria c/o High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/19] | 01 /
NIEUWLANDS, Eric Johannus Hendricus Cornelis Maria c/o High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15731590.4 | 25.06.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015EP64426 | Priority number, date | EP20140175240 | 01.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14175240 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016001065 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165051 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H05B45/10 (EP,CN,US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
H05B47/16 (US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Title | German: | LED-TREIBER, BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM MIT DEM TREIBER UND ANSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/19] | English: | LED DRIVER, LIGHTING SYSTEM USING THE DRIVER AND DRIVING METHOD | [2017/19] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DE DEL, SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE UTILISANT LE CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTAQUE | [2017/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/16] | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JP2005071770 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,9-11,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] - [0056] * [A] 6-8,14 [Y] 4,5,12,13; | [A]WO2006074299 (JOHNSON & SON INC S C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* page 10, paragraph 43 - page 12, paragraph 49; claims 1-20 *; | [X]WO2008060842 (APPLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 4-5; figures 2, 4, 7, 8 * * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 13 * * page 5, line 11 - page 10, line 30 * * page 12, line 5 - page 16, line 2 *; | [XAY]EP2051235 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,7-9,14,15 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraph 13 - page 5, paragraph 15 * * page 5, paragraph 20 - page 7, paragraph 33 * [A] 6 [Y] 2-5,10-13; | [YD]US2011068689 (SCENINI ANDREA [IT], et al) [YD] 2-5,10-13 * page 1, paragraphs 2, 6; figures 1, 4 * * page 1, paragraph 26 - page 2, paragraph 28 * * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 3, paragraph 33 * * page 5, paragraph 64; table 3 *; | [X]US2012249013 (VALOIS CHARLES BERNARD [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAY]WO2012154639 (LUTRON ELECTRONICS CO [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,15 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,14 [Y] 2-5,10-13; | [XY]WO2013102854 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,6-9,14,15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 8 * * page 8, paragraph 32 - page 16, paragraph 59 * [Y] 2-5,10-13 | by applicant | US2011068689 |