EP3145374 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AND DISPENSING A BOILING LIQUID AND APPARATUS FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE PROVIDED WITH SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUEGAN, Laurent Le Verley F-74150 Lornay / FR | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Bourrières, Patrice SEB Développement SAS Campus SEB 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15732023.5 | 11.05.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015FR51236 | Priority number, date | FR20140054672 | 23.05.2014 Original published format: FR 1454672 | [2017/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015177434 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3145374 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/54, A47J27/21 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
A47J31/545 (EP,US);
A47J31/00 (CN);
A47J31/4403 (CN);
A47J31/467 (CN);
A47J31/56 (EP,CN,US);
A47J27/21041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND AUSGABE VON KOCHENDER FLÜSSIGKEIT UND EINRICHTUNG MIT SOLCH EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GETRÄNKS | [2017/13] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AND DISPENSING A BOILING LIQUID AND APPARATUS FOR PREPARING A BEVERAGE PROVIDED WITH SUCH A DEVICE | [2017/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE EN ÉBULLITION ET APPAREIL DE PRÉPARATION DE BOISSON ÉQUIPÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 14.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2718516 (BUNN O MATIC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-16* page 5, line 31 - page 10, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR2968183 (SEB SA [FR]) [Y] 1-16 * page 10, line 5 - page 17, line 9; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | FR2983692 |