Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017320951 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP64933 | 01.07.2015 | EP14306073 | 02.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170021354 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP64933 | 01.07.2015 | EP14306073 | 02.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2988504 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP64933 | 01.07.2015 | EP14306073 | 02.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3164713 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP64933 | 01.07.2015 | EP14306073 | 02.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016001276 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14306073 | 02.07.2014 |