EP3164713 - METHODS FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING CD1D RESTRICTED GAMMA/DELTA T CELL LYMPHOMAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LYSARC (LYMPHOMA ACADEMIC RESEARCH ORGANISATION) Centre Hospitalier Lyon-Sud Secteur Sainte Eugénie - Pavillon 6D 69495 Pierre-Bénite Cedex / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Claude Bernard Lyon 1 43 Boulevard du 11 Novembre 1918 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | |||
For all designated states Ecole Normale Supérieure de Lyon (ENS Lyon) 46, Allée d'Italie 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENESTIER, Laurent C/o CENTRE DE RECHERCHE EN CANCEROLOGIE DE LYON INSERM U1052 - CNRS UMR5286 Centre Léon Bérard - Univ. Claude Bernard Lyon 1 Fac. de Méd. Lyon Sud 165 chemin du Petit Revoyet 69600 OULLINS / FR | 02 /
BACHY, Emmanuel Centre Hospitalier Lyon Sud - Service Hématologie Chemin du Grand Revoyet 69495 Pierre Benite / FR | 03 /
DEFRANCE, Thierry INSERM U1111 CNRS UMR 5308 21 Avenue Tony Garnier 69007 Lyon / FR | [2017/25] |
Former [2017/19] | 01 /
GENESTIER, Laurent INSERM U1111 CNRS 5308 ENS de Lyon UCBL 1 21 Avenue Tony Garnier / 69007 Lyon / FR | ||
02 /
BACHY, Emmanuel Centre Hospitalier Lyon Sud - Service Hématologie Chemin du Grand Revoyet 69495 Pierre Benite / FR | |||
03 /
DEFRANCE, Thierry INSERM U1111 CNRS UMR 5308 21 Avenue Tony Garnier 69007 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 87 rue de Sèze 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Regimbeau 139, rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15732717.2 | 01.07.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015EP64933 | Priority number, date | EP20140306073 | 02.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14306073 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016001276 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3164713 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
C07K16/2833 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
C07K16/3061 (US);
C12N15/115 (US);
G01N33/57492 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/569 (US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2310/16 (US);
C12N2320/31 (US);
G01N2333/70539 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON CD1D-BESCHRÄNKTEN GAMMA/DELTA-T-ZELL-LYMPHOMEN | [2017/19] | English: | METHODS FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING CD1D RESTRICTED GAMMA/DELTA T CELL LYMPHOMAS | [2017/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT DE LYMPHOMES À CELLULE ET GAMMA/DELTA RESTREINTE EN CD1D | [2018/33] |
Former [2017/19] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DE LYMPHOMES À CELLULES T GAMMA/DELTA RESTREINTES AU CD1D | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 01.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/44] | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011311445 (ALVAREZ VERNON L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,4,10 *; | [A]US2006057145 (BERZOFSKY JAY A [US], et al) [A] 9-15 * claims 1,13,15 * | [A] - M. DIEUDE ET AL, "Cardiolipin Binds to CD1d and Stimulates CD1d-Restricted T Cells in the Normal Murine Repertoire", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2011), vol. 186, no. 8, pages 4771 - 4781, XP055159865 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1000921 | [A] - S. E.A. STREET, "Innate Immune Surveillance of Spontaneous B Cell Lymphomas by Natural Killer Cells and T Cells", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 199, no. 6, pages 879 - 884, XP055159817 [A] 1-15 * last sentence of the first paragraph of the Results and Discussion section; page 880, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20031981 | [A] - B BISIG ET AL, "New biomarkers in T-cell lymphomas", BEST PRACTICE & RESEARCH CLINICAL HAEMATOLOGY, (2012), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 13 - 28, XP002712810 [A] 1-8 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.beha.2012.01.004 | [A] - C. PAGET ET AL, "Role of T Cells in -Galactosylceramide-Mediated Immunity", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2012), vol. 188, no. 8, pages 3928 - 3939, XP055159815 [A] 6 * page 3930, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1103582 | [A] - TENG M W ET AL, "CD1d Activation and Blockade: A New Antitumor Strategy", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, (2009), vol. 182, no. 6, pages 3366 - 3371, XP002712812 [A] 9-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.0802964 |