EP3183619 - CONTROL TERMINAL FOR PROCESSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIG Technology AG Laufengasse 18 8212 Neuhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/26] | For all designated states SIG Technology AG Laufengasse 18 8212 Neuhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZKÄMPER, Peter Erich Kästnerstrasse 14 52499 Baesweiler / DE | 02 /
HOFMANN, Thomas Herderstrasse 34 49078 Osnabrück / DE | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 15733441.8 | 01.07.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015EP64949 | Priority number, date | DE20141012185 | 20.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014012185 | [2017/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016026601 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183619 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, G06F3/0346 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP,CN,US);
B65B17/00 (US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (US);
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
B65B57/00 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32014 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/36159 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/36542 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/39449 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | BEDIENTERMINAL FÜR VERARBEITUNGSANLAGEN | [2017/26] | English: | CONTROL TERMINAL FOR PROCESSING SYSTEMS | [2017/26] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMANDE POUR INSTALLATIONS DE TRAITEMENT | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 16.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/12] | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1447770 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8,9* paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-2b *; | [Y]DE102010001019 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-3,6,7,11,14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0002] *; | [YA]FR2990286 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [Y] 8,9 * page 4, line 21 - page 14, line 15; figures 1-12 * [A] 1; | [X]DE102012010721 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7,11,14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-9 *; | [YA]EP2711796 (FERAG AG [CH]) [Y] 4,5 * abstract * [A] 1; | [Y]DE102012019347 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-9,11,14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US2013335203 |