Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9939915 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | B2 | US2017277271 | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP01325 | 01.07.2015 | DE102014013763 | 05.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3188922 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2019 | B1 | EP3188922 | 12.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP01325 | 01.07.2015 | DE102014013763 | 05.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016034256 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014013763 | 05.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014013763 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014013763 | 05.09.2014 |