EP3247843 - LOCKING AND REGULATION DEVICE FOR PANELS AND SLABS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IND.I.A. S.p.A. Via Vicenza, 8/12 36034 Malo (VI) / IT | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONZATO, Dario Via S. Nicolo' 3 I-36015 Schio (VI) / IT | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Burchielli, Riccardo, et al Barzano & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | De Giorgi, Michele, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Rome / IT | Application number, filing date | 15734244.5 | 25.03.2015 | [2017/48] | WO2015IT00079 | Priority number, date | IT2014VI00075 | 25.03.2014 Original published format: IT VI20140075 | [2017/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015145477 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247843 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
E04F11/1812 (EP,US);
E04F11/1834 (US);
E04F11/1853 (EP,US);
E04F2011/1823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGS- UND REGULIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR PLATTEN UND TAFELN | [2017/48] | English: | LOCKING AND REGULATION DEVICE FOR PANELS AND SLABS | [2017/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE ET DE RÉGULATION POUR PANNEAUX ET PLAQUES | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/16] | 26.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 27.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/50] | 07.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001025953 (SHEPHERD JOHN D [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0035] , [0038] * * figures 11-13 *; | [A]DE202007009239U (BANGRATZ RENE [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0035] , [0037] , [0039] , [0046] * * figures 1,2,7 *; | [A]FR2930270 (OLIVIER JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2013121330 (METALGLAS BONOMI S R L [IT]) [A] 1-9* figures 2,2a,2b,3 *; | [A]DE202012104033U (PAULI & SOHN GMBH METALLWAREN [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 21] , [0023] , [0028] * * figures 1,2,3,5,7 * |