Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3164674
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.04.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
19.12.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.06.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
12.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
08.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
22.08.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
07.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
07.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
17.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
18.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|