EP3092908 - FODDER COMPRESSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin, Sang Man 216-27 (Gunja-dong), Siheung-daero Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 429-802 / KR | [2016/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2/1 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 15734876.4 | 07.01.2015 | [2016/46] | WO2015KR00130 | Priority number, date | KR20140002235 | 08.01.2014 Original published format: KR 20140002235 | [2016/46] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015105323 | Date: | 16.07.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3092908 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23N17/02, A23N17/00, B02C23/02, B02C11/04, B02C4/08, B02C4/32, A23K40/20, A23K10/30, A23K50/30, A01F25/20 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
A01F25/2018 (EP,US);
A23N17/005 (KR);
B02C18/142 (US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A23K40/20 (EP,US);
A23K50/30 (EP,US);
A23N17/008 (KR);
A23N17/02 (EP,US);
B02C11/04 (EP,US);
B02C18/22 (US);
B02C18/2216 (US);
B02C23/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/46] | A23N17/02, A01F25/16, A23N17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] | Title | German: | FUTTERVERDICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/46] | English: | FODDER COMPRESSION DEVICE | [2016/46] | French: | PRESSE À FOURRAGE | [2016/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2016 | Translation filed | 08.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/46] | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2009154585 (OZ BINGOL [TR], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,10,15,16 * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 23; figure - * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US5626095 (RUNION DERWOOD L [US]) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-4 * * column 6, lines 9-38; figures 8-9 *; | [Y]US3130708 (MACKENZIE EDWARD T) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 37; figure - *; | [Y]EP2641853 (BERTOLINI JOSE [BR], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0008] - [0011]; figure - *; | [Y]US2019274 (SEYMOUR) [Y] 3 * page 1, column 2, lines 9-16 * * page 2, column 2, lines 61-65; figure - *; | [Y]US3995768 (MONTALBANO ANTHONY P, et al) [Y] 3 * column 7, lines 28-31; figures 2-3,5 *; | [Y]US3251558 (LESLIE PALYI) [Y] 3 * column 3, lines 37-40 * * column 8, lines 15-18; figure - * | International search | [X]JP2007068499 (NAT AGRICULTURE & FOOD RES ORG, et al); | [A]KR20020085352 (HWANG YOUNG GU [KR]); | [A]KR100484297B (DOOBAE SYSTEM); | [A]KR200442679Y (YOUN, YONG KI); | [A]KR20110024095 (KOREA MACH & MATERIALS INST [KR]) | by applicant | KR20140002235 | KR200143791Y |