EP3166992 - BINDER CONTAINING WHEY PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation SPRL Rue de Maestricht 95 4600 Visé / BE | For all designated states Knauf Insulation, Inc. One Knauf Drive Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPSON, Carl PO Box 10 Knauf Insulation Stafford Road St Helens Merseyside WA10 3NS / GB | 02 /
PACOREL, Bénédicte ARC-IP Rue Emile Francqui 4 B-1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Farmer, Guy Dominic ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui, 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | Application number, filing date | 15735949.8 | 09.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015EP65662 | Priority number, date | GB20140012335 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: GB 201412335 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005481 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166992 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08H1/00, C08L89/00, C09D189/00, C09J189/00 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
C09D189/00 (EP,US);
C08H1/00 (EP,US);
C08L89/00 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
C09J189/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L89/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Title | German: | BINDEMITTEL MIT MOLKEPROTEIN | [2017/20] | English: | BINDER CONTAINING WHEY PROTEIN | [2017/20] | French: | LIANT CONTENANT UNE PROTÉINE DE LACTOSÉRUM | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/23] | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010120356 (UNIV VERMONT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 2, line 13 - page 7, line 24; page 10, line 5 - page 20, line 24; claims 1-101; figures 1-15; examples *; | [X]WO2004009252 (UNIV VERMONT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 2, lines 5-21; page 3, line 1 - page 8, line 3; claims 1-106; figures 1 and 2; examples *; | [X]CA2495140 (UNIV VERMONT [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 13; page 2, line 20 - page 7, line 29; claims 1-48; examples *; | [XA]WO0049899 (INST NAT RECH SCIENT [CA], et al) [X] 12-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 7, lines 12-29; claims 1-23; figures 1-26; examples, table 1 * [A] 1-11; | [XA]WO0137683 (LACROIX MONIQUE [CA], et al) [X] 12-15 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 5, lines 12-34; claims 1-5; figures 1-52; examples; tables 3 and 5 * [A] 1-11; | [A]US4524164 (VISWANATHAN TITO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |