06.05.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
02.02.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.09.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.09.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.08.2021 |
First examination report |
|
28.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
15.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
18.08.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
27.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
18.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
18.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
25.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
10.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|