Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019085204 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815910455 | 02.03.2018 | WO2015EP65662 | 09.07.2015 | GB201412335 | 11.07.2014 | US201715324719 | 08.01.2017 | US201815992096 | 29.05.2018 | US201816105623 | 20.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017210945 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP65662 | 09.07.2015 | GB201412335 | 11.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3166992 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP65662 | 09.07.2015 | GB201412335 | 11.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016005481 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201412335 | 11.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201412335D0 | 27.08.2014 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201412335 | 11.07.2014 |