EP3148889 - TRANSPORT AND STORAGE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A TRANSPORT AND STORAGE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/14] | A TRANSPORT AND STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
[2020/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Softbox Systems Limited Ridge Way Unit 1 Long Crendon, Buckinghamshire HP18 9BF / GB | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATTAM, Edwin Francis Grove Farm Cottage Lower Cheriton Lane North Cheriton Somerset BA8 0AP / GB | 02 /
BEECH, Ross Malcolm 118 Church Street Chesham Huckinghamshire HP5 1JD / GB | 03 /
JARVIS, James Nathan 36 Eagle Close Leighton Buzzard Bedfordshire LU7 4AT / GB | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Humphrey-Evans, Edward John, et al HEIPS 1 Hawkes Close Wokingham, Berkshire RG41 2SZ / GB | [2021/01] |
Former [2017/14] | Humphrey-Evans, Edward John Humphrey-Evans Intellectual Property Services Limited 1 Hawkes Close Wokingham Berkshire RG41 2SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15735999.3 | 01.06.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015GB00157 | Priority number, date | GB20140009689 | 30.05.2014 Original published format: GB 201409689 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015181515 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3148889 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3148889 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/38, B65D21/02, // B65D81/38 | [2020/43] | CPC: |
B65D19/385 (EP,GB,US);
B65D19/06 (EP,US);
B65D19/20 (GB);
B65D21/0201 (EP,US);
B65D71/0096 (EP,US);
B65D81/3816 (US);
F25D3/06 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00029 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00064 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00099 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00129 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00134 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00139 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00159 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00164 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00169 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00174 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00184 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00194 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00203 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00208 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00218 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00293 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00373 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00452 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00497 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00597 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00601 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00661 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00711 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00805 (EP,US);
B65D2519/0091 (EP,GB,US);
B65D2519/0096 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00975 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00037 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00055 (EP,US);
B65D81/389 (EP,US);
F25D2303/082 (EP,US);
F25D2303/0843 (EP,US);
F25D2303/0844 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | B65D19/06, B65D19/38, B65D21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORT- UND LAGERANORDNUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINER TRANSPORT- UND LAGERANORDNUNG | [2020/43] | English: | TRANSPORT AND STORAGE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A TRANSPORT AND STORAGE ASSEMBLY | [2020/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT ET DE STOCKAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT ET DE STOCKAGE | [2020/43] |
Former [2017/14] | TRANSPORT- UND AUFBEWAHRUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2017/14] | A TRANSPORT AND STORAGE SYSTEM | ||
Former [2017/14] | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT ET DE STOCKAGE | Entry into regional phase | 26.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 26.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.10.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 15.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.08.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 31.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2015 | AL | 06.01.2021 | CY | 06.01.2021 | EE | 06.01.2021 | ES | 06.01.2021 | FI | 06.01.2021 | HR | 06.01.2021 | LT | 06.01.2021 | LV | 06.01.2021 | MC | 06.01.2021 | MK | 06.01.2021 | MT | 06.01.2021 | RO | 06.01.2021 | RS | 06.01.2021 | SE | 06.01.2021 | SI | 06.01.2021 | SK | 06.01.2021 | SM | 06.01.2021 | BG | 06.04.2021 | NO | 06.04.2021 | GR | 07.04.2021 | IS | 06.05.2021 | PT | 06.05.2021 | LU | 01.06.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.06.2015 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
MK | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 01.06.2015 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
CY | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 01.06.2015 | |
AL | 06.01.2021 | ||
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SI | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.01.2021 | |
EE | 06.01.2021 | ||
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
MC | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | EE | 06.01.2021 | |
ES | 06.01.2021 | ||
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RO | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SK | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 06.01.2021 | |
FI | 06.01.2021 | ||
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
SM | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IS | 06.05.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
SE | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
LV | 06.01.2021 | ||
RS | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
BG | 06.04.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
GR | 07.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
HR | 06.01.2021 | ||
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 06.01.2021 | |
LT | 06.01.2021 | ||
NO | 06.04.2021 | ||
PT | 06.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3995736 (LAWSON DEWAYNE L, et al) [X] 1,5-8,11,12,18,21,26 * column 5, line 36 - column 11, line 47; figures 1-25 * [Y] 4,10,13,14,17,19,22-24 [I] 27; | [XY]US5279423 (SHUERT LYLE H [US]) [X] 1,2,5-9,11,17,21,26,27 * column 3, line 24 - column 10, line 62; figures 1-21 * [Y] 4,10,13,14,17,19,22-24; | [XYI]US2005017000 (VERGIELS MICHAEL R O [US], et al) [X] 1,5-8,11,12,21,26 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 4,10,13,14,17,19,22-24 [I] 27; | [XYI]US2007227936 (YOUELL DONALD R JR [US]) [X] 1,5-8,11,21,26 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0032] * * figures 1-10 * [Y] 4,10,13,14,17,19,22-24 [I] 27; | [XYI]US3480196 (SIMAS JOHN DE) [X] 1,5-8,11,20,21,26 * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 29; figures 1-9 * [Y] 4,10,13,14,17,19,22-24 [I] 27; | [XYI]EP0960821 (SMURFIT CORRUGATED HEAVY DUTY [GB]) [X] 1,5-7,11,12,20,21,26 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-11 * [Y] 4,10,13,14,17,19,22-24 [I] 27; | [Y]DE102006022196 (FESER MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0063] * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5638983 (BAZANY DONALD J [US]) [Y] 10 * column 1, line 47 - line 59 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4643314 (KIDD GARRY B [US]) [Y] 13,17 * column 3, line 62 - column 6, line 60; figures 1-13 *; | [Y]US5356014 (BERNER KURT [CH]) [Y] 13 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 61; examples 1-12 *; | [Y]FR2530222 (SUBERT RAYMOND [FR]) [Y] 14 * page 4, line 28 - page 6, line 19 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2013036707 (ZACCHI LUCA [IT]) [Y] 19,22 * paragraphs [0058] , [0071] , [0072] , [0078]; figures 7-10,19; claims 1,5 *; | [YA]US2013020309 (TATTAM EDWIN FRANCIS [GB], et al) [Y] 23,24 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1-11 * [A] 1-22,25-28 | [Y] - "RETURNABLE PACKAGING", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20000101), no. 429, ISSN 0374-4353, page 122, XP000976434 [Y] 4 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2636609 | AT3117U |