EP3167245 - METHOD FOR NAVIGATING A USER BETWEEN A FIRST POSITION INSIDE A BUILDING AND A SECOND POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALTINGER, Harald Schwanenstrasse 5 85049 Gerolfing / DE | 02 /
SCHULLER, Florian Johann-Theodor-Strasse 3 85737 Ismaning / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15736402.7 | 11.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015EP01424 | Priority number, date | DE20141013208 | 06.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014013208 | [2017/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016034258 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167245 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167245 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20, G01C21/32, G01C21/36 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G01C21/206 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/362 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/3685 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/3688 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/3837 (EP,CN,US);
G08G1/13 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NAVIGATION EINES BENUTZERS ZWISCHEN EINER ERSTEN POSITION INNERHALB EINES GEBÄUDES UND EINER ZWEITEN POSITION | [2017/20] | English: | METHOD FOR NAVIGATING A USER BETWEEN A FIRST POSITION INSIDE A BUILDING AND A SECOND POSITION | [2017/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LA NAVIGATION D'UN UTILISATEUR ENTRE UNE PREMIÈRE POSITION À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UN BÂTIMENT ET UNE DEUXIÈME POSITION | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 07.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2015 | AL | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | CZ | 24.01.2018 | DK | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | ES | 24.01.2018 | FI | 24.01.2018 | HR | 24.01.2018 | IT | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | LV | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | MK | 24.01.2018 | MT | 24.01.2018 | NL | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | RS | 24.01.2018 | SE | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | SM | 24.01.2018 | TR | 24.01.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | NO | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | IE | 11.07.2018 | LU | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.07.2015 | |
AL | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MK | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 11.07.2015 | |
AL | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
LU | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 24.01.2018 | |
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [ID]US2009058685 (MC CALL CLARK E [US], et al) [ID] 1-4,6-14 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0032]; figures 1,3,5,8,9 *; | [A]WO2010051510 (TEMIC AUTOMOTIVE NA INC [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] *; | [I]US2012316774 (YARIV ERAN [IL], et al) [I] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030] - [0044]; figure 5 *; | [L]DE102014013207 (AUDI AG [DE]) [L] 1-14* the whole document * |