EP3158774 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE MEMBRANE PUMP/TRANSDUCER AND METHODS TO MAKE AND USE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clean Energy Labs, LLC 8906 Wall Street Suite 810 Austin, Texas 78754 / US | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINKERTON, Joseph, F. 2312 Woodlawn Blvd. Austin, TX 78703 / US | 02 /
EVERETT, William, Neil 3115 Millstream Dr Cedar Park, TX 78613 / US | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15736708.7 | 18.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015US36487 | Priority number, date | US201414309615 | 19.06.2014 Original published format: US201414309615 | US201414309635 | 19.06.2014 Original published format: US201414309635 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015195952 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158774 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/28, H04R19/02 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H04R1/345 (EP);
A61B8/4483 (EP);
H04R1/1016 (EP);
H04R1/26 (EP);
H04R1/2896 (EP);
H04R1/403 (EP);
H04R19/02 (EP);
H04R2307/023 (EP);
H04R2499/11 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGE MEMBRANPUMPEN/WANDLER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/17] | English: | ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE MEMBRANE PUMP/TRANSDUCER AND METHODS TO MAKE AND USE SAME | [2017/17] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR/POMPE À MEMBRANE ÉLECTROCONDUCTRICE, ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 20.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/06] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1345469 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-11,13,16,21,24,25,27-30,32-35,37-40,42,43,45,49,51-53 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] - [0059]; figures 1A,1B,2 * [I] 4,6,7,12-14,31,36,46-48; | [XI]US3590169 (MERHAUT JOSEF) [X] 1,17,20,22,28 * the whole document * [I] 15,18,19,54-57; | [X]JP2003169386 (SHARP KK) [X] 1,23,28,44 * abstract * | [X] - QIN ZHOU ET AL, "Electrostatic graphene loudspeaker", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (20130101), vol. 102, no. 22, doi:10.1063/1.4806974, ISSN 0003-6951, page 223109, XP055212008 [X] 1,4,5,28 * abstract * * page 2, column left, line 25 - page 3, column left, line 41 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4806974 | by applicant | - LEE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, pages 385 - 388 | WO2009US59266 | WO2011US55167 | WO2011US66497 | WO2011US23618 |