EP3095807 - STAMPABLE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYOSHI, Katsuhiro c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO, Takafumi c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 03 /
BAMBA, Kenta c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 04 /
NARUSE, Yoshihiro c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 05 /
TOKUNAGA, Takuro c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2016/47] | Application number, filing date | 15737092.5 | 13.01.2015 | [2016/47] | WO2015JP50607 | Priority number, date | JP20140006938 | 17.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014006938 | [2016/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015108021 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3095807 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, D04H1/4242, B32B5/26, B32B5/02, B32B27/12, B32B27/20, B32B27/08, B32B7/04 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
C08J5/042 (EP,US);
C08J5/043 (EP,US);
C08J5/048 (EP,US);
D04H1/4242 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/20 (EP,US);
B32B2260/023 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2262/02 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,US);
B32B2262/10 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/103 (EP,US);
B32B2262/105 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/14 (EP,US);
B32B2264/0214 (EP,US);
B32B2264/10 (EP,US);
B32B2264/101 (EP,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,US);
B32B2264/104 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2307/302 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/003 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | C08J5/04, D04H1/4242, B32B5/26 | ||
Former IPC [2016/47] | C08J5/04, D04H1/4242 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Title | German: | AUSSTANZBARES BLATT | [2016/47] | English: | STAMPABLE SHEET | [2016/47] | French: | FEUILLE ESTAMPABLE | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2016 | Translation filed | 08.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 08.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 26.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO2013118689 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]WO2012086682 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011178890 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JP2005271350 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]US6503856 (BROADWAY ANDREW [US], et al); | [AE]JP5687812B (TEIJIN LTD.); | [AP]WO2014081002 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [AE]WO2015023000 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2011178890 | JP2010235779 |