EP3094352 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT AND DETECTION OF CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Academia Sinica 128, Sec. 2 Academia Sinica Road Nan-Kang Taipei 115 / TW | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Chi-Huey P.O. Box 8154 Rancho Santa Fe, California 92067 / US | 02 /
LOU, Yi-Wei 2F. No. 1 Ln. 92 Xinmin Street Nangang District Taipei City 115 / TW | 03 /
LIN, Chih-Wei 12F. No. 179-3 Maijin Road Anle District Keelung City 204 / TW | 04 /
YEH, Shih-Chi c/o Academia Sinica 128 Academia Road Section 2 Nankang Taipei 115 / TW | 05 /
HSU, Tsui-Ling No. 266 DongShih Stret Xi-Zhi District New Taipei City 221 / TW | 06 /
WU, Chung-Yi No. 78-1 Dongshi Street Xi-Zhi District New Taipei City 221 / TW | 07 /
WU, Han-Chung 12F.-1 No. 10 Lane 43 Sanmin Road, Songshan District Taipei City 105 / TW | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15737180.8 | 16.01.2015 | [2016/47] | WO2015US11748 | Priority number, date | US201461928132P | 16.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461928132 P | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015109180 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3094352 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3094352 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, C07K16/30, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, G01N33/574, C12N5/095 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/3053 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/57492 (KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/565 (KR,US);
C07K2317/567 (KR);
C07K2317/622 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/734 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/47] | A61K39/395, G01N33/574 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND ZUM NACHWEIS VON KREBS | [2016/47] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT AND DETECTION OF CANCERS | [2016/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR TRAITER ET DÉTECTER DES CANCERS | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 17.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2015 | AL | 23.09.2020 | AT | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | ES | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | IT | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MK | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | RS | 23.09.2020 | SE | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | SM | 23.09.2020 | TR | 23.09.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | GR | 24.12.2020 | IE | 16.01.2021 | LU | 16.01.2021 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 16.01.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
TR | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.01.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.01.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 16.01.2015 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
AT | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
GR | 24.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
SE | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY] - KANNAGI R ET AL, "Stage-specific embryonic antigens (SSEA-3 and -4) are epitopes of a unique globo-series ganglioside isolated from human teratocarcinoma cells", EMBO JOUR, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (19830101), vol. 2, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 2355 - 2361, XP008102258 [ID] 1-3,6-8,12-14,35-37 * whole document, especially the Abstract; Table II * [Y] 15-22 | [IY] - Y.-J. LIANG ET AL, "Switching of the core structures of glycosphingolipids from globo- and lacto- to ganglio-series upon human embryonic stem cell differentiation", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20101213), vol. 107, no. 52, doi:10.1073/pnas.1007290108, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 22564 - 22569, XP055394006 [I] 1-3,6-8,12-14,35-37 * whole document, especially the abstract; paragraph bridging the columns of page 22564 * [Y] 15-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1007290108 | [IY] - KATAGIRI Y U ET AL, "Laminin binding protein, 34/67 laminin receptor, carries stage-specific embryonic antigen-4 epitope defined by monoclonal antibody Raft.2", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 332, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2005.05.052, ISSN 0006-291X, (20050715), pages 1004 - 1011, (20050608), XP027218738 [I] 1-3,6-8,12-14,35-37 * whole document, especially the Abstract; page 1005, left-hand column, lines 3-9 * [Y] 15-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2005.05.052 | [IDY] - Y.-L. HUANG ET AL, "Carbohydrate-based vaccines with a glycolipid adjuvant for breast cancer", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20130125), vol. 110, no. 7, doi:10.1073/pnas.1222649110, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2517 - 2522, XP055394157 [ID] 1-3,6-8,12-14,35-37 * whole document, especially the Abstract; Figures 5, 7; Supplementary Figure S2; sentence bridging pages 2520-2521 and following paragraph * [Y] 15-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1222649110 | [T] - Anonymous, "Anti-Stage-Specific Embryonic Antigen-4 Antibody, clone MC-813-70 | MAB4304", (2017), URL: https://www.merckmillipore.com/NL/en/product/Anti-Stage-Specific-Embryonic-Antigen-4-Antibody,-clone-MC-813-70,MM_NF-MAB4304, (20170726), XP055394107 [T] 1-3,6-8,12-22,35-37 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]WO2006064983 (KOREA RES INST OF BIOSCIENCE [KR], et al) [X] 1, 3, 4 * entire document * [Y] 39; | [A]WO2008087260 (SUOMEN PUNAINEN RISTI VERIPALV [FI], et al) [A] 1, 3, 4, 13, 14, 26-37, 39 * entire document *; | [Y]US2009123439 (YUN KYUSON [US], et al) [Y] 31-35 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012328646 (WONG CHI-HUEY [TW], et al) [Y] 34 * entire document *; | [XY]WO2013130603 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 26-30 * entire document * [Y] 36; | [Y]WO2013152034 (MERRIMACK PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [Y] 39 * entire document *; | [XY] - MARCATO et al., "Chapter 17: The Rocky Road from Cancer Stem Cell Discovery to Diagnostic Applicability", Cancer Stem Cells Theories and Practice, (20110322), pages 335 - 360, URL: http://www.intechopen.com/download/pdf/14473, XP055231292 [X] 37 * . entire document * [Y] 31-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5772/13923 | [PX] - LOU et al., "Stage Specific Embryonic Antigen-4 as a Potential Therapeutic Target in Glioblastoma Multiforme and other Cancers", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (20140218), vol. 111, no. 7, pages 2482 - 2487, XP055218264 [PX] 1, 3, 4, 13, 14, 26-37, 39 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1400283111 | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0003089 | USRE30985E | US4419446 | US4560655 | US4601978 | WO8700195 | US4657866 | US4676980 | US4767704 | US4816567 | WO9003430 | US4927762 | US4965199 | US4975278 | EP0404097 | WO9100360 | US5004697 | WO9110741 | US5061620 | WO9200373 | US5112596 | WO9209690 | US5122469 | WO9301161 | WO9306213 | WO9308829 | WO9316185 | US5264365 | US5268164 | WO9404690 | WO9411026 | WO9607754 | US5506206 | US5508192 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5565332 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571894 | US5580717 | US5587458 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5639635 | US5641870 | US5648237 | US5661016 | US5686416 | US5733743 | WO9824893 | US5840523 | US5869046 | US6004940 | US6027888 | US6083715 | US6265150 | US6329173 | US2002025313 | US2002038086 | US2002065259 | US2003073713 | US2003083299 | US2003104402 | US2003129186 | US2003162695 | WO03077945 | EP1391213 | US6703019 | US2004131692 | US2004204354 | US2005089473 | US2005124533 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - ABRAHMSEN et al., EMBO J., (19850000), vol. I; II, page 3901 | - CHOTHIA et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. I-IV, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 154; 155, pages 323 - 327 | - CHEN, Y. et al., J. Mol Biol, (19990000), vol. 293, pages 865 - 881 | - PRESTA et al., Cancer Res., (19970000), vol. 57, pages 4593 - 4599 | - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - KOHLER et al., Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - HAMMERLING et al., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell hybridomas, Elsevier, (19810000), vol. 73, pages 563 - 681 | - TOMLINSON et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - SIDHU et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 340, no. 5, pages 1073 - 1093 | - FELLOUSE, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20040000), vol. 101, no. 34, pages 12467 - 12472 | - LEE et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (20040000), vol. 284, no. 1-2, pages 119 - 132 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 7889 - 7893 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGEMANN et al., Year in Immunol., (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - MARKS et al., Bio. Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LONBERG et al., Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, pages 812 - 813 | - FISHWILD et al., Nature Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 826 - 851 | - LONBERGHUSZAR, Intern. Rev. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - PRESTA, Curr. Op. Struct. Biol., (19920000), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - VASWANIHAMILTON, Ann. Allergy, Asthma & Immunol., (19980000), vol. 1, pages 105 - 115 | - HARRIS, Biochem. Soc. Transactions, (19950000), vol. 23, pages 1035 - 1038 | - HURLEGROSS, Curr. Op. Biotech., (19940000), vol. 5, pages 428 - 433 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - BARBAS et al., Proc Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 113, pages 3809 - 3813 | - CARTER et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - ; SCHIER et al., Gene, (19950000), vol. 159, pages 203 - 155 | - JACKSON et al., J. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 2004 | - HAWKINS et al., J. Mol. Biol., vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - AGNEW, Chem. Intl. Ed. Engl., (19940000), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - VERHOEYEN et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - KOZBOR, J. Immunol., (19840000), vol. 133, page 3001 | - BRODEUR et al., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, American Society for Microbiology, (19870000), vol. 2, pages 1190 - 1219 | - GUSS et al., EMBO J., (19860000), vol. 5, pages 15671575 - 103 | - BARNES et al., Anal. Biochem., (19800000), vol. 102, page 255 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - SKERRA et al., Curr. Opinion in Immunol., (19930000), vol. 5, pages 256 - 262 | - PLUCKTHUN, Immunol. Rev., (19920000), vol. 130, pages 151 - 188 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (19840000), vol. 81, page 6851 | - NEUBERGER et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 314, page 452 | - PRESTA et al., J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 151, page 2623 | - CARTER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA et al., J. Immnol., (19930000), vol. 151, page 2623 | - BRUGGERMANN et al., Year in Immuno., (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - WINTER et al., Annu. Rev. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19820000), vol. 297, pages 598 - 601 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Nuc. Acids. Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - FREDMAN PHOIST HCOLLINS VPGRANHOLM LVENNERHOLM L, "Sialyllactotetraosylceramide, a ganglioside marker for human malignant gliomas", J Neurochem, (19880000), vol. 50, no. 3, pages 912 - 919 | - HARA et al., Microbial Drug Resistance, (19960000), vol. 2, pages 63 - 72 | - CHEN et al., J Bio Chem, (19990000), vol. 274, pages 19601 - 19605 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 1-3, pages 4133 - 4137 | - WINTER et al., Ann. Rev. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - GRIFFITHS et al., EMBO J, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - ORLANDI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. (USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 5728 - 5732 | - JONES et al., Biotechnol., (19910000), vol. 9, pages 88 - 89 | - ORUM et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 4491 - 4498 | - MATSUDA et al., Nature Genet., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 88 - 94 | - CARTER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 4285 - 3580 | - WILLIAMSWINTER, Eur. J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 23, pages 1456 - 1461 | - HOGREFE et al., Gene, (19930000), vol. 128, pages 119 - 126 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - BARBAS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - EMBLETON et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 3831 - 3837 | - BASS et al., Proteins, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 309 - 314 | - MARKS et al., Biotechnol., (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - PLUCKTHUN, Immunol. Revs, (19920000), vol. 130, page 151 | - LEUNG et al., Technique, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 11 - 15 | - ENGELS et al., Agnew. Chem., (19890000), vol. 28, pages 716 - 734 | - Methods in Enzymology, (19760000), vol. 44 | - SIEBENLIST et al., Cell, (19800000), vol. 20, page 269 | - YANSURA et al., METHODS: A Companion to Methods in Enzymol., (19920000), vol. 4, pages 151 - 158 | - SIMMONS et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (20020000), vol. 263, pages 133 - 147 | - BOTHMANNPLUCKTHUN, J. Biol. Chem., (20000000), vol. 275, pages 17106 - 17113 | - ARIE et al., Mol. Microbiol., (20010000), vol. 39, pages 199 - 210 | - LINDMARK et al., J. Immunol. Meth., (19830000), vol. 62, pages 1 - 13 | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen Virol., (19770000), vol. 36, page 59 | - URLAUB et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4216 | - TM4, Mather, Biol. Reprod., (19800000), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER et al., Annals N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19820000), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - HAM et al., Meth. Enz., (19790000), vol. 58, page 44 | - MORIMOTO et al., Journal of Biochemical and Biophysical Methods, (19920000), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - BRENNAN et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, page 81 | - BOERNER et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, page 60 | - BRUGGERMANN et al., Year in Immunol, (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - MILSTEINCUELLO, Nature, (19830000), vol. 305, page 537 | - TRAUNECKER et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, page 3655 | - SURESH et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19860000), vol. 121, page 210 | - SHALABY et al., J. Exp. Med., (19920000), vol. 175, pages 217 - 225 | - KOSTELNY et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553 | - GRUBER et al., J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, page 5368 | - CUNNINGHAMWELLS, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - A. L. LEHNINGE, Biochemistry, Worth Publishers, (19750000), pages 73 - 75 | - SYRIGOSEPENETOS, Anticancer Research, (19990000), vol. 19, pages 605 - 614 | - NICULESCU-DUVAZSPRINGER, Adv. Drg Del. Rev., (19970000), vol. 26, pages 151 - 172 | - BALDWIN et al., Lancet, (19860315), pages 603 - 05 | - THORPE et al., "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (19850000), vol. 84, pages 475 - 506 | - ROWLAND et al., Cancer Immunol. Immunother., (19860000), vol. 21, pages 183 - 87 | - MANDLER et al., Jour. of the Nat. Cancer Inst., (20000000), vol. 92, no. 19, pages 1573 - 1581 | - MANDLER et al., Bioorganic & Med. Chem. Letters, (20000000), vol. 10, pages 1025 - 1028 | - MANDLER et al., Bioconjugate Chem., (20020000), vol. 13, pages 786 - 791 | - LIU et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 8618 - 8623 | - LODE et al., Cancer Res., (19980000), vol. 58, page 2928 | - HINMAN et al., Cancer Res., (19930000), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342 | - KAM et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20050000), vol. 102, pages 11600 - 11605 | - TRAYLOR TDHOGAN EL, "Gangliosides of human cerebral astrocytomas", JNeurochem, (19800000), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 126 - 131 | - MARASCO, Gene Therapy, (19970000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 15 | - KONTERMANN, Methods, (20040000), vol. 34, pages 163 - 170 | - CHEN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19990000), vol. 96, pages 4325 - 4329 | - PAPANASTASSIOU et al., Gene Therapy, (20020000), vol. 9, pages 398 - 406 | - BOBO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 2076 - 2080 | - GILL et al., Nature Med., (20030000), vol. 9, pages 589 - 595 | - SVENNERHOLM L et al., "Human brain gangliosides: developmental changes from early fetal stage to advanced age", Biochim Biophys Acta, (19890000), vol. 1005, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0005-2760(89)90175-6, pages 109 - 117, XP023577891 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2760(89)90175-6 | - eptide and Protein Drug Delivery, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19910000), pages 247 - 301 | - JONES, A., Adv. Drug Delivery Rev., (19930000), vol. 10, pages 29 - 90 | - LOUIS DN et al., "The 2007 WHO classification of tumours of the central nervous system", Acta Neuropathol, (20070000), vol. 114, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s00401-007-0243-4, pages 97 - 109, XP055450017 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00401-007-0243-4 | - VAN MEIR EG et al., "Exciting new advances in neuro-oncology: the avenue to a cure for malignant glioma", CA Cancer J Clin, (20100000), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 166 - 193 | - MEYER MA, "Malignant gliomas in adults", N Engl J Med, (20080000), vol. 359, no. 17, page 1850 | - MEEZAN EWU HCBLACK PHROBBINS PW, "Comparative studies on the carbohydrate-containing membrane components of normal and virus-transformed mouse fibroblasts. II. Separation of glycoproteins and glycopeptides by sephadex chromatography", Biochemistry, (19690000), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 2518 - 2524 | - HAKOMORI S, "Glycosylation defining cancer malignancy: new wine in an old bottle", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 16, pages 10231 - 10233 | - LAU KSDENNIS JW, "N-Glycans in cancer progression", Glycobiology, (20080000), vol. 18, no. 10, pages 750 - 760 | - VAN BEEK WPSMETS LAEMMELOT P, "Increased sialic acid density in surface glycoprotein of transformed and malignant cells--a general phenomenon?", Cancer Res, (19730000), vol. 33, no. 11, pages 2913 - 2922 | - SELL S, "Cancer-associated carbohydrates identified by monoclonal antibodies", Hum Pathol, (19900000), vol. 21, no. 10, doi:10.1016/0046-8177(90)90250-9, pages 1003 - 1019, XP026242978 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0046-8177(90)90250-9 | - HAKOMORI SZHANG Y, "Glycosphingolipid antigens and cancer therapy", Chem Biol, (19970000), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90253-2, pages 97 - 104, XP009010432 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90253-2 | - TAYLOR-PAPADIMITRIOU JEPENETOS AA, "Exploiting altered glycosylation patterns in cancer: progress and challenges in diagnosis and therapy", Trends Biotechnol, (19940000), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0167-7799(94)90121-X, pages 227 - 233, XP023595355 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(94)90121-X | - BIRKLE SZENG GGAO LYU RKAUBRY J, "Role of tumor-associated gangliosides in cancer progression", Biochimie, (20030000), vol. 85, no. 3-4, pages 455 - 463 | - FREDMAN P et al., "Potential ganglioside antigens associated with human gliomas", Neurol Res, (19860000), vol. 8, no. 2, pages 123 - 126 | - YATES AJBECKER LESACHS LA, "Brain tumors in childhood", Childs Brain, (19790000), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 31 - 39 | - BERRA BGAINI SMRIBONI L, "Correlation between ganglioside distribution and histological grading of human astrocytomas", Int J Cancer, (19850000), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 363 - 366 | - MANSSON JE et al., "Characterization of new gangliosides of the lactotetraose series in murine xenografts of a human glioma cell line", FEBS Lett, (19860000), vol. 201, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0014-5793(86)80580-4, pages 109 - 113, XP025592230 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(86)80580-4 | - FREDMAN PHOIST HCOLLINS VPDELLHEDEN BSVENNERHOLM L, "Expression of gangliosides GD3 and 3'-isoLMl in autopsy brains from patients with malignant tumors", J Neurochem, (19930000), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 99 - 105 | - KATO Y et al., "GMab-1, a high-affinity anti-3'-isoLMl/3',6'-isoLDl IgG monoclonal antibody, raised in lacto-series ganglioside-defective knockout mice", Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20100000), vol. 391, no. 1, pages 750 - 755 | - SCHENKEL-BRUNNER H, P System, Human Blood Groups, (19950000), pages 211 - 234 | - KANNAGI R et al., "Stage-specific embryonic antigens (SSEA-3 and -4) are epitopes of a unique globo-series ganglioside isolated from human teratocarcinoma cells", EMBO J, (19830000), vol. 2, no. 12, pages 2355 - 2361, XP008102258 | - ZHANG S et al., "Selection of tumor antigens as targets for immune attack using immunohistochemistry: I. Focus on gangliosides", Int J Cancer, (19970000), vol. 73, no. 1, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19970926)73:1<42::AID-IJC8>3.0.CO;2-1, pages 42 - 49, XP055550796 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19970926)73:1<42::AID-IJC8>3.0.CO;2-1 | - CHANG WW et al., "Expression of Globo H and SSEA3 in breast cancer stem cells and the involvement of fucosyl transferases 1 and 2 in Globo H synthesis", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 33, doi:10.1073/pnas.0804979105, pages 11667 - 11672, XP009124986 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0804979105 | - HUANG YL et al., "Carbohydrate-based vaccines with a glycolipid adjuvant for breast cance", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20130000), vol. 110, no. 7, doi:10.1073/pnas.1222649110, pages 2517 - 2522, XP055394157 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1222649110 | - SAITO S et al., "xpression of globo-series gangliosides in human renal cell carcinoma", Jpn J Cancer Res, (19970000), vol. 88, no. 7, pages 652 - 659 | - KANNAGI R et al., "New globoseries glycosphingolipids in human teratocarcinoma reactive with the monoclonal antibody directed to a developmentally regulated antigen, stage-specific embryonic antigen 3", J Biol Chem, (19830000), vol. 258, no. 14, pages 8934 - 8942 | - WANG CC et al., "Glycan microarray of Globo H and related structures for quantitative analysis of breast cancer", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20080000), vol. 105, no. 33, pages 11661 - 11666 | - ZAREI MMUTHING JPETER-KATALINIC JBINDILA L, "Separation and identification of GMlb pathway Neu5Ac- and Neu5Gc gangliosides by on-line nanoHPLC-QToF MS and tandem MS: toward glycolipidomics screening of animal cell lines", Glycobiology, (20100000), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 118 - 126 | - GOTTSCHLING S et al., "Stage-specific embryonic antigen-4 is expressed in basaloid lung cancer and associated with poor prognosis", Eur Respir J, (20130000), vol. 41, no. 3, doi:10.1183/09031936.00225711, pages 656 - 663, XP055142330 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1183/09031936.00225711 | - YE FLI YHU YZHOU CCHEN H, "Stage-specific embryonic antigen 4 expression in epithelial ovarian carcinoma", Int J Gynecol Cancer, (20100000), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 958 - 964 | - BRIMBLE SN et al., "The cell surface glycosphingolipids SSEA-3 and SSEA-4 are not essential for human ESC pluripotency", Stem Cells, (20070000), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 54 - 62 | - VAN SLAMBROUCK SSTEELANT WF, "Clustering of monosialyl-Gb5 initiates downstream signalling events leading to invasion of MCF-7 breast cancer cells", Biochem J, (20070000), vol. 401, no. 3, doi:10.1042/BJ20060944, pages 689 - 699, XP008140655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BJ20060944 | - HUNG TCLIN CWHSU TLWU CYWONG CH, "Investigation of SSEA-4 binding protein in breast cancer cells", JAm Chem Soc, (20130000), vol. 135, no. 16, doi:10.1021/ja312210c, pages 5934 - 5937, XP055218262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja312210c | - SAITO S et al., "Human alpha2,3-sialyltransferase (ST3Gal II) is a stage-specific embryonic antigen-4 synthase", J Biol Chem, (20030000), vol. 278, no. 29, pages 26474 - 26479 | - KUDO T et al., "Up-regulation of a set of glycosyltransferase genes in human colorectal cancer", Lab Invest, (19980000), vol. 78, no. 7, pages 797 - 811 | - GREEN MR, "Targeting targeted therapy", N Engl J Med, (20040000), vol. 350, no. 21, pages 2191 - 2193 | - MISHIMA K et al., "Growth suppression of intracranial xenografted glioblastomas overexpressing mutant epidermal growth factor receptors by systemic administration of monoclonal antibody (mAb) 806, a novel monoclonal antibody directed to the receptor", Cancer Res, (20010000), vol. 61, no. 14, pages 5349 - 5354 | - WIKSTRAND CJCOKGOR ISAMPSON JHBIGNER DD, "Monoclonal antibody therapy of human gliomas: current status and future approaches", Cancer Metastasis Rev, (19990000), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 451 - 464 | - DURRANT LGNOBLE PSPENDLOVE I, "Immunology in the clinic review series; focus on cancer: glycolipids as targets for tumour immunotherapy", Clin Exp Immunol, (20120000), vol. 167, no. 2, pages 206 - 215 | - YU AL et al., "Anti-GD2 antibody with GM-CSF, interleukin-2, and isotretinoin for neuroblastoma", N Engl J Med, (20100000), vol. 363, no. 14, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa0911123, pages 1324 - 1334, XP055045834 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0911123 | - LOBUGLIO, A.F.WHEELER, R.H.TRANG, J.HAYNES, A.ROGERS, K.HARVEY, E.B.SUN, L.GHRAYEB, J.KHAZAELI, M.B., "Mouse/human chimeric monoclonal antibody in man: kinetics and immune response", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19890000), vol. 86, doi:10.1073/pnas.86.11.4220, pages 4220 - 4224, XP002100301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.11.4220 | - LU, R.-M.CHANG, Y.-L.CHEN, M.-S.WU, H.-C., "Single chain anti-c-Met antibody conjugated nanoparticles for in vivo tumor-targeted imaging and drug delivery", Biomaterials, (20110000), vol. 32, pages 3265 - 3274 | - ROGUSKA, M.A.PEDERSEN, J.T.KEDDY, C.A.HENRY, A.H.SEARLE, S.J.LAMBERT, J.M.GOLDMACHER, V.S.BLATTLER, W.A.REES, A.R.GUILD, B.C., "Humanization of murine monoclonal antibodies through variable domain resurfacing", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19940000), vol. 91, doi:10.1073/pnas.91.3.969, pages 969 - 973, XP002271704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.3.969 |