|
01.09.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.06.2018 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.06.2018 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2015 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
31 |