EP3094239 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING PRE-SCALED IMAGES FOR A SERIES OF MAMMOGRAPHY IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA HEALTHCARE Inc. 5975 Falbourne Street, Suite 2 Mississauga, ON L5R 3V8 / CA | [2021/12] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Agfa HealthCare Inc. 5975 Falbourne Street Mississauga, ON L5R 3V8 / CA | ||
Former [2016/47] | For all designated states AGFA Healthcare 5975 Falbourne Street Mississauga, Ontario L5R 3V8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOPYLOV, Viktor 557 Isaiah Crescent Kitchener, Ontario N2E 0B4 / CA | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Verbrugghe, Anne Marie L., et al Agfa HealthCare NV IP Department 3800 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2016/47] | Application number, filing date | 15737601.3 | 14.01.2015 | [2016/47] | WO2015CA00021 | Priority number, date | US201414155851 | 15.01.2014 Original published format: US201414155851 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015106339 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3094239 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3094239 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/40, A61B6/00, // A61B6/02, A61B6/03 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
A61B6/502 (EP,US);
A61B6/463 (EP,US);
A61B6/466 (EP,US);
A61B6/5235 (EP,US);
G06T3/40 (EP,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/486 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/47] | A61B5/00, A61B90/00, A61B6/03, G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VORSKALIERTER BILDER FÜR EINE SERIE VON MAMMOGRAFIEBILDERN | [2016/47] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR GENERATING PRE-SCALED IMAGES FOR A SERIES OF MAMMOGRAPHY IMAGES | [2016/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR GÉNÉRER DES IMAGES PRÉ-MISES À L'ÉCHELLE POUR UNE SÉRIE D'IMAGES MAMMOGRAPHIQUES | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 07.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | IE | 14.01.2023 | LU | 14.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.01.2023 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007122021 (ZINGARETTI GABRIELE [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2010122204 (SONNEMANS JEROEN [NL]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 3,6 *; | [Y]US2010128950 (WOODS KEVIN [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 3,4 *; | [XY]EP2372649 (AGFA HEALTHCARE INC [CA]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1,2A,2B * [Y] 2-5,8-10; | [A]EP2629263 (AGFA HEALTHCARE [BE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0060] * * figure 8 * | International search | [A]US7599542 (BROCKWAY JOHN PHILIP [US], et al); | [AP]US8923594 (WEHNES JEFFREY C [US], et al) |