EP3158801 - SYSTEM INFORMATION DECODING BY A MULTI-SIM COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEL, Neha 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHAKRAVARTHY, Chetan, Gopalakrishnan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [2017/17] | Application number, filing date | 15738160.9 | 11.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015US35309 | Priority number, date | US201414310807 | 20.06.2014 Original published format: US201414310807 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015195459 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3158801 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W60/00 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W8/186 (KR,US);
H04L47/245 (KR,US);
H04W60/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W88/06 (KR,US);
H04W8/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEMINFORMATIONSDECODIERUNG DURCH EINE MULTI-SIM-KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/17] | English: | SYSTEM INFORMATION DECODING BY A MULTI-SIM COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2017/17] | French: | DÉCODAGE D'INFORMATIONS SYSTÈME PAR UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION DOTÉ DE PLUSIEURS SIM | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 02.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 14.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2012149361 (ESCH MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1-30 * figures 4,7 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0020] , [0021] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0174] *; | [Y]EP2605562 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-30 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0048] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 1-6, 9, 10 *; | [A]US2013303240 (SANKA SURESH [IN], et al) [A] 1-30 * figures 1,4,6 * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2003181216 (TSAI HSIEN-MING [TW], et al) [A] 1-30 * figures 1(b),3 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0046] * * claim 5 *; | [A]WO2013035065 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 16 * * page 9, line 25 - page 13, line 30 * * figures 1-3 * |