EP3204281 - ELECTRIC MOTOR VEHICLE FOR TRANSPORT OF GOODS MADE OF A ROTOMOULDED BODY SUPPORTED BY A MODULAR TUBULAR FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interactive Fully Electrical Vehicles S.r.l. Via Carle 1 12048 Sommariva del Bosco (CN) / IT | [2020/28] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Interactive Fully Electrical Vehicles S.r.l. Via Carle 1 12048 Sommariva del Bosco (CN) / IT | ||
For all designated states Poli-Model S.r.l. Strada Carignano 46/1 10024 Moncalieri (TO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERLO, Pietro c/o P-GEVS S.r.l. Via Simioli 23 I-10098 Rivoli (TO) / IT | 02 /
GUERRIERI, Pietro c/o P-GEVS S.r.l. Via Simioli 23 I-10098 Rivoli ( TO) / IT | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Metroconsult Srl Via Sestriere, 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Metroconsult Srl Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | ||
Former [2017/33] | Reposio, Giancarlo, et al c/o Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 15738983.4 | 03.06.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015IB54204 | Priority number, date | IT2014TO00805 | 08.10.2014 Original published format: IT TO20140805 | [2017/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016055874 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204281 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3204281 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/11, B60K1/00, B62D23/00, B62D29/04, B62D63/02 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
B62D23/005 (EP,CN,US);
B62D21/11 (EP,CN,US);
B29C39/08 (US);
B29C39/10 (US);
B60K1/02 (US);
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60K17/354 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B62D29/005 (EP,CN,US);
B62D29/043 (EP,CN,US);
B62D33/044 (US);
B62D63/025 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (US);
B29L2031/3002 (US);
B60K1/00 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/001 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2001/0438 (US);
B60L2200/36 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTORFAHRZEUG ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN VON WAREN AUS EINEM VON EINEM MODULAREN ROHRRAHMEN GETRAGENEN ROTATIONSGEFORMTEN KÖRPER | [2017/33] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR VEHICLE FOR TRANSPORT OF GOODS MADE OF A ROTOMOULDED BODY SUPPORTED BY A MODULAR TUBULAR FRAME | [2017/33] | French: | VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR TRANSPORT DE MARCHANDISES, CONSTITUÉ D'UN CORPS FORMÉ PAR ROTOMOULAGE SUPPORTÉ PAR UN CADRE TUBULAIRE MODULAIRE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 02.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.03.2020 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | RS | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 03.06.2020 | LU | 03.06.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 03.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 03.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 03.06.2020 | ||
LU | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9521762 (RINGDAL PATENTER AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * figure - * [A] 3,4; | [YA]FR2721559 (BELAUD MAURICE JOSEPH [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * page 13, lines 5,6; figures 1,2a,4a,4b,4d,4f * [A] 3,4; | [A]WO2011032560 (ECOMOVE APS [DK], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 6, lines 22-25 * * page 10, lines 27-31 ** figures 2,5,10,11 *; | [YA]CN102328702 (GE YING) [Y] 1,2,5 * abstract * [A] 3,4; | [XAY]CA2717163 (MYNHEER ANDREW SIMON, et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-10,17 * * claim 1 * * page 10, line 16 - page 13, line 25 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 2,5; | [YA]US2012175897 (RAWLINSON PETER DORE [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0040] - [0047]; figure - * [A] 3,4; | [YA]FR2972169 (COURB [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5 * page 6, line 15 - page 9, line 4 * * figures 1-8A * * page 23, lines 13-25 * [A] 3,4 | by applicant | IT2014TO00305 |