EP3143440 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DOWNHOLE OBJECT LOCATION AND ORIENTATION DETERMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silixa Limited Silixa House 230 Centennial Park Centennial Avenue Elstree, Hertfordshire WD6 3SN / GB | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILNE, Craig c/o Silixa Ltd. Silixa House 230 Centennial Park Centennial Avenue Elstree Hertfordshire WD6 3SN / GB | 02 /
FRANKEY, Brian c/o Silixa Ltd. Silixa House 230 Centennial Park Centennial Avenue Elstree Hertfordshire WD6 3SN / GB | 03 /
PARKER, Tom c/o Silixa Ltd. Silixa House 230 Centennial Park Centennial Avenue Elstree Hertfordshire WD6 3SN / GB | 04 /
FARHADIROUSHAN, Mahmoud c/o Silixa Ltd. Silixa House 230 Centennial Park Centennial Avenue Elstree Hertfordshire WD6 3SN / GB | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Wallin, Nicholas James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/09] |
Former [2017/12] | Wallin, Nicholas James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15739311.7 | 15.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015GB51448 | Priority number, date | US201461994474P | 16.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461994474 P | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015173592 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143440 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3143440 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/0224, G01V11/00, G01V1/44 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
G01V1/44 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G01V1/46 (US);
E21B47/022 (GB);
E21B47/0224 (EP,US);
E21B47/024 (GB);
E21B47/095 (US);
G01C9/00 (GB);
G01D5/14 (US);
G01V1/226 (GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/12] | G01V11/00, G01V1/44, E21B47/022 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON BOHRLOCHOBJEKTLAGE UND -AUSRICHTUNG | [2017/12] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DOWNHOLE OBJECT LOCATION AND ORIENTATION DETERMINATION | [2017/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA LOCALISATION ET L'ORIENTATION D'OBJET DE FOND DE TROU | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 05.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24158247.7 / EP4345508 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5904210 (STUMP GREGORY S [US], et al); | [Y]US2003011490 (BAILEY JEFFREY R [US], et al); | [Y]US7578359 (COATES RICHARD [US], et al); | [XYI]US2010039286 (ROBBINS CARL A [US]); | [Y]US2012022825 (WOOTTEN KEITH ROBERT [GB]); | [Y]US2012126992 (RODNEY PAUL F [US], et al); | [XI]WO2013030555 (OPTASENSE HOLDINGS LTD [GB], et al) | Examination | US2674049 | US2010175923 | US2014053750 |