EP3320621 - UPLINK SPECTRUM ANALYSIS TECHNIQUE FOR PASSIVE INTERMODULATION (PIM) DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/22] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPORTE, Pierre-Andre 280-11, boulevard de l'Europe Gatineau, Québec J9J 0P2 / CA | 02 /
WYVILLE, Mark William 2061 Lenester Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2A 1K6 / CA | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2019/22] |
Former [2018/20] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15739340.6 | 08.07.2015 | [2018/20] | WO2015IB55174 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017006155 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3320621 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3320621 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, G01R23/20 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H04B1/1027 (EP,US);
H04W52/241 (US);
H04B1/109 (EP,US);
H04W24/06 (US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W52/143 (US);
H04W52/16 (US);
H04W52/52 (US);
H04L1/20 (US);
H04W24/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UPLINK-SPEKTRALANALYSEVERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PASSIVER INTERMODULATION (PIM) | [2018/20] | English: | UPLINK SPECTRUM ANALYSIS TECHNIQUE FOR PASSIVE INTERMODULATION (PIM) DETECTION | [2018/20] | French: | TECHNIQUE D'ANALYSE DE SPECTRE DE LIAISON MONTANTE POUR UNE DÉTECTION D'INTERMODULATION PASSIVE (PIM) | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 08.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2015 | AL | 29.05.2019 | AT | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | ES | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | IT | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | NL | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | RS | 29.05.2019 | SE | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | IE | 08.07.2019 | LU | 08.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | NO | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.07.2015 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IE | 08.07.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LU | 08.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US6374096 (PARR MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1,2,8,9,15,16,22,23 * column 4, line 33 - line 45; figure 2 * * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 3; claim 1 * [A] 3-7,10-14,17-21,24,25; | [YA]US2014153418 (HARIHARAN SRIKANTH [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,9,15,16,22,23 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0100]; figures 8A, 8B *[A] 3-7,10-14,17-21,24,25 |