EP3160606 - INTERACTIVE PLAY SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2017/18] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Haiyan c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SCOTT, James William c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
VILLAR, Nicolas c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
BUNTING, Alexandra Keeley c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
SCHUNEMAN, Lee Jason c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
ROUSE, Michael Paul c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2021/32] |
Former [2017/18] | 01 /
ZHANG, Haiyan c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way, Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | ||
02 /
SCOTT, James William c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
03 /
VILLAR, Nicolas c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
04 /
BUNTING, Alexandra Keeley c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
05 /
SCHUNEMAN, Lee Jason c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | |||
06 /
ROUSE, Michael Paul c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2021/50] |
Former [2017/18] | Wallis, Helen Frances Mary, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15739398.4 | 29.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US38215 | Priority number, date | US201414318945 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US201414318945 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016003844 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3160606 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3160606 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/235, A63F13/21, A63F13/327 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A63H33/26 (EP,CN,US);
A63F13/327 (EP,CN,US);
A63F13/21 (EP,CN,US);
A63F13/235 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERAKTIVE SPIELSÄTZE | [2017/18] | English: | INTERACTIVE PLAY SETS | [2017/18] | French: | ENSEMBLES JEU INTERACTIF | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 27.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2015 | AL | 15.12.2021 | AT | 15.12.2021 | CY | 15.12.2021 | CZ | 15.12.2021 | DK | 15.12.2021 | EE | 15.12.2021 | ES | 15.12.2021 | FI | 15.12.2021 | HR | 15.12.2021 | IT | 15.12.2021 | LT | 15.12.2021 | LV | 15.12.2021 | MC | 15.12.2021 | MK | 15.12.2021 | NL | 15.12.2021 | PL | 15.12.2021 | RO | 15.12.2021 | RS | 15.12.2021 | SE | 15.12.2021 | SI | 15.12.2021 | SK | 15.12.2021 | SM | 15.12.2021 | TR | 15.12.2021 | BG | 15.03.2022 | NO | 15.03.2022 | GR | 16.03.2022 | IS | 15.04.2022 | PT | 18.04.2022 | IE | 29.06.2022 | LU | 29.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
MK | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 29.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CY | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.06.2015 | |
AL | 15.12.2021 | ||
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
IT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
LU | 29.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
IE | 29.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
MC | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SI | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 15.12.2021 | |
AT | 15.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
DK | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IS | 15.04.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 15.12.2021 | |
CZ | 15.12.2021 | ||
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
PL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 15.12.2021 | |
EE | 15.12.2021 | ||
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SK | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 15.12.2021 | |
ES | 15.12.2021 | ||
FI | 15.12.2021 | ||
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RO | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
PT | 18.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
SM | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
NL | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
NO | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
HR | 15.12.2021 | ||
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
LV | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
SE | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
GR | 16.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 15.12.2021 | |
LT | 15.12.2021 | ||
RS | 15.12.2021 | ||
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 15.12.2021 | |
BG | 15.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 15.03.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011215998 (FITZGERALD BRENT PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0099] , [0101]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0131] - [0140]; figures 26-39 ** claims 1-4 * |