EP3100283 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRICALLY STABLE CONNECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Angiometrix Corporation 6708 Honesty Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATIL, Nitin 435 Gooding Way 454 Albany, California 94706 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15740141.5 | 27.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015US13077 | Priority number, date | US201461931862P | 27.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461931862 P | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015113044 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100283 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/08, H01B7/02, H01B7/00 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A61B5/6851 (EP,US);
H05K1/0268 (US);
A61M25/09 (US);
H05K1/0296 (EP,US);
H05K1/118 (EP,US);
H05K3/10 (US);
H05K3/4644 (US);
A61B2562/12 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09108 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTRISCH STABILE VERBINDER | [2016/49] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTRICALLY STABLE CONNECTORS | [2016/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR CONNECTEURS ÉLECTRIQUEMENT STABLES | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 24.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005061540 (PARKER KENNETH P [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0044] - [0051]; figure - * [A] 9,10; | [XY]US2006097737 (PARKER KENNETH P [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0044] - [0048]; figure - * [Y] 9,10; | [XA]US2006103405 (PARKER KENNETH P [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0013]; figure 2 * [A] 9,10; | [Y]US2011306867 (GOPINATHAN VENUGOPAL [IN], et al) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0209] - [0235]; figure - *; | [A]WO2013169492 (ANGIOMETRIX CORP [US]) [A] 1,9,10* paragraphs [0066] - [0075]; figure - * | International search | [A]US2006091994 (NELSON CHARLES S [US]); | [X]US2011028816 (SIMPSON PETER C [US], et al); | [Y]US2011230735 (WOLFE KATHERINE T [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011028816 | US8374689 | US2013123694 | US8494794 | US2014142398 | US8798712 | US8825151 |