EP3012165 - WORK VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR EMERGENCY RUNNING OF WORK VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komatsu Ltd. 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8414 / JP | [2016/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHIMOTO, Yasuki c/o KOMATSU LTD. Development Division 1200 Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8567 / JP | 02 /
MONDEN, Hiroshi c/o KOMATSU LTD. Development Division 1200 Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8567 / JP | 03 /
MIYAMOTO, Shunsuke c/o KOMATSU LTD. Development Division 1200 Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8567 / JP | 04 /
OHKURA, Yasunori c/o KOMATSU LTD. Development Division 1200 Manda Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-8567 / JP | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/17] | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15740285.0 | 19.01.2015 | [2016/17] | WO2015JP51260 | Priority number, date | JP20140012023 | 27.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014012023 | [2016/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015111549 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3012165 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/10, B60K6/365, B60K6/445, B60K6/54, B60L3/00, B60L11/14, B60W10/02, B60W10/04, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/101, B60W20/00, F02D29/00, F02D29/04, F02D29/06, F16H3/66, F16H3/72, B60W50/029 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60K6/54 (US);
B60K6/547 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L15/2054 (EP,US);
B60L3/0061 (EP,US);
B60L3/04 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (US);
B60W10/101 (US);
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60W20/50 (EP,US);
B60W50/029 (US);
E02F3/283 (US);
E02F9/02 (US);
E02F9/202 (US);
E02F9/2217 (US);
F16H3/725 (US);
F16H61/0267 (US);
B60K1/02 (US);
B60K2006/381 (EP,US);
B60K2006/4816 (US);
B60L2200/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
F16H2037/049 (US);
F16H3/724 (US);
F16H3/727 (US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
Y02T90/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | B60W10/10, B60K6/365, B60K6/445, B60K6/54, B60L3/00, B60L11/14, B60W10/02, B60W10/04, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/101, B60W20/00, F02D29/00, F02D29/04, F02D29/06, F16H3/66, F16H3/72 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Title | German: | ARBEITSFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN FÜR NOTBETRIEB EINES ARBEITSFAHRZEUGS | [2016/17] | English: | WORK VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR EMERGENCY RUNNING OF WORK VEHICLE | [2016/17] | French: | ENGIN DE CHANTIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'URGENCE D'ENGIN DE CHANTIER | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2016 | Translation filed | 19.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 19.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1884685 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7,11-13 * paragraphs [0042] - [0057] - [0096]; figures 1,2,12 * [A] 8-10,14; | [YA]US2005184529 (UEDA HIDEO [JP]) [Y] 1-6,11,12 * paragraphs [0003] - [0012] - [0 42] - [0050] - [0 73] - [0083]; figures 1-4A, 5A * [A] 7-10,13,14; | [Y]WO2009037996 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,11,12 * paragraph [0086]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]US2013006489 (KIM SANG JOON [KR]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,11,13 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 68] , [0 69]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2006170120 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1,2,6,7,11,13 * paragraphs [0075] , [0 76]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2202430 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2006329244 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006170120 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]WO2013140541 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2006329244 |