Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
23.03.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.03.2018 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.02.2018 | Change - representative | |
21.07.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
21.07.2017 | Change - classification | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
21.07.2017 | Change - classification | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
24.03.2017 | Change - extension states | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] |
07.02.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant | |
18.11.2016 | Change - applicant | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
28.10.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
14.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.08.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.08.2016 | Change - representative | |
17.08.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.08.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.08.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |