EP3097709 - AUTHENTICATION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Everykey, Inc. 11471 Euclid Avenue 305 Cleveland OH 44106 / US | [2016/51] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Everykey LLC 11471 Euclid Avenue 305 Cleveland, Ohio 44106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENTZ, Christopher 1988 Ford Drive Cleveland, Ohio 44106 / US | 02 /
QIAN, Xiqian No 5 Building Second Unit Apt. 201 Fanhai International Juzhuqu Xianghaiyuan (West Gate), 95 Yaojiayuan Road, Chaoyang Beijing / CN | 03 /
BEREZYUK, Ruslan TTE Gral Juan Peron 1833 6 B Buenos Aires C1040AAA / AR | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Braddon, Nicholas Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15740986.3 | 20.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015US12032 | Priority number, date | US201461929845P | 21.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461929845 P | US201414333598 | 17.07.2014 Original published format: US201414333598 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015112493 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3097709 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L9/12, H04L9/32, H04W12/08, G06F21/34, G06F21/44 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/44 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L9/12 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | H04W12/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2016/48] | English: | AUTHENTICATION DEVICE AND METHOD | [2016/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUTHENTIFICATION | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 05.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013268767 (SCHRECKER SVEN [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 30] , [0 34] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0 46] , [0 50] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0 85] , [0 88] *; | [X]US8321922 (LO YUNG-CHIEH [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 13-60 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 11 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 16 *; | [X]WO2013127521 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 10, line 3 - page 11, line 18 *; | [A]US2007297609 (ADAMS NEIL [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 20] , [0 21] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 27] , [0 28] * | International search | [X]US2007159301 (HIRT FRED S [US], et al); | [X]US8430310 (HO HARVEY [US], et al); | [X]US2011300928 (BENBRAHIM JAMAL [US]); | [Y]US2011231914 (HUNG MICHAEL [CA]); | [Y]US6416471 (KUMAR HARPAL S [GB], et al); | [Y]US2004064699 (HOOKER JOHN KENNETH [US], et al); | [A]US2007192599 (KATO JUNJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2007200671 (KELLEY NIA L [US], et al) |