EP3193911 - IMPROVED FACTOR VIII PREPARATIONS FOR USE IN TREATING HEMOPHILIA A [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/30] | IMPROVED FACTOR VIII PREPARATIONS SUITABLE FOR THERAPEUTIC USE AND PROCESSES TO OBTAIN THESE | ||
[2023/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2023/36] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDBAUER, Stefan Am Hofacker 11 35094 Lahntal / DE | 02 /
METZNER, Hubert Im Boden 6 35041 Marburg / DE | 03 /
ROBBEL, Lars Elbinger Strasse 12 35083 Wetter / DE | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | CSL Global IP C/o CSL Behring GmbH Global Intellectual Property Emil-von-Behring-Straße 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2023/36] |
Former [2017/30] | Hauser, Hans-Peter, et al CSL Behring GmbH Patents & Licenses Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15741222.2 | 24.07.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015EP67014 | Priority number, date | EP20140178563 | 25.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14178563 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016012595 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3193911 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3193911 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/37, A61P7/04 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A61K38/37 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
G01N33/68 (US);
G01N2333/755 (US);
G01N33/15 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE FAKTOR-VIII-PRÄPARATE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON HÄMOPHILIE A | [2023/13] | English: | IMPROVED FACTOR VIII PREPARATIONS FOR USE IN TREATING HEMOPHILIA A | [2023/13] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS DE FACTEUR VIII AMÉLIORÉES POUR L'UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'HÉMOPHILIE A | [2023/13] |
Former [2017/30] | VERBESSERTE FAKTOR-VIII-PRÄPARATIONEN FÜR THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHALTUNG DERSELBEN | ||
Former [2017/30] | IMPROVED FACTOR VIII PREPARATIONS SUITABLE FOR THERAPEUTIC USE AND PROCESSES TO OBTAIN THESE | ||
Former [2017/30] | PRÉPARATIONS AMÉLIORÉES DE FACTEUR VIII APPROPRIÉS POUR UNE UTILISATION THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'OBTENTION | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 20.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0023116 (AVIGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 * * page 32, lines 13-20 * * example 10 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO2013057219 (CSL BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 * * page 3, lines 12-14 * * examples 1,3,5 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY] - WAKABAYASHI HIRONAO ET AL, "Ca2+ binding to both the heavy and light chains of factor VIII is required for cofactor activity", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20020702), vol. 41, no. 26, doi:10.1021/BI025589O, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 8485 - 8492, XP002410844 [X] 1,3,5,6,8,10,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi025589o | Examination | WO9109122 |