06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
19.11.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
17.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
27.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
11.12.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
05.12.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.12.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.12.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.11.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
29.07.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
03.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
12.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
28.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.08.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.07.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
28.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
03.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
17.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|